LA HCR23 | 2024 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on May 8 2024 - 100% progression
Action: 2024-05-09 - Taken by the Clerk of the House and presented to the Secretary of State in accordance with the Rules of the House.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on May 8 2024 - 100% progression
Action: 2024-05-09 - Taken by the Clerk of the House and presented to the Secretary of State in accordance with the Rules of the House.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Designates the city of Carencro as the Seasoning Capital of the World
Title
Designates the city of Carencro as the Seasoning Capital of the World
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2024-05-06 - Senate - Senate Vote on HCR 23 CONCUR (#518) (Y: 36 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2024-04-17 - House - House Vote on HCR 23 FINAL CONSIDERATION (#557) (Y: 96 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 9) [PASS]
2024-04-17 - House - House Vote on HCR 23 FINAL CONSIDERATION (#557) (Y: 96 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 9) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-05-09 | House | Taken by the Clerk of the House and presented to the Secretary of State in accordance with the Rules of the House. |
2024-05-08 | Senate | Signed by the President of the Senate. |
2024-05-08 | House | Enrolled and signed by the Speaker of the House. |
2024-05-07 | House | Received from the Senate without amendments. |
2024-05-06 | Senate | Read by title and concurred in by a vote of 36 yeas and 0 nays. Ordered returned to the House. |
2024-04-30 | Senate | Reported favorably. |
2024-04-22 | Senate | Read second time by title and referred to the Committee on Judiciary A. |
2024-04-17 | Senate | Received in the Senate. Read first time by title and placed on the Calendar for a second reading. |
2024-04-17 | House | Read by title, roll called on final consideration, yeas 96, nays 0. The resolution was adopted and ordered to the Senate. |
2024-04-16 | House | Scheduled for floor debate on 04/17/2024. |
2024-04-15 | House | Read by title, ordered engrossed, passed to 3rd reading. |
2024-04-11 | House | Reported favorably (13-0). |
2024-03-19 | House | Read by title, under the rules, referred to the Committee on Judiciary. |
2024-03-18 | House | Read by title. Lies over under the rules. |