LA HCR216 | 2010 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on June 16 2010 - 100% progression
Action: 2010-06-18 - Taken by the Clerk of the House and presented to the Secretary of State in accordance with the Rules of the House.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on June 16 2010 - 100% progression
Action: 2010-06-18 - Taken by the Clerk of the House and presented to the Secretary of State in accordance with the Rules of the House.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Suspends, from Aug. 10, 2010, through Aug. 13, 2010, the state excise tax on cigars and smoking tobacco given away by a dealer (EN -$45,000 GF RV See Note)
Title
Suspends, from Aug. 10, 2010, through Aug. 13, 2010, the state excise tax on cigars and smoking tobacco given away by a dealer (EN -$45,000 GF RV See Note)
Sponsors
Roll Calls
Senate - Senate Vote on HCR 216, ADOPT (#1555) (Y: 29 N: 1 NV: 9 Abs: 0) [PASS]
House - House Vote on HCR 216, FINAL CONSIDERATION (#1240) (Y: 66 N: 18 NV: 21 Abs: 0) [PASS]
House - House Vote on HCR 216, FINAL CONSIDERATION (#1240) (Y: 66 N: 18 NV: 21 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2010-06-18 | Taken by the Clerk of the House and presented to the Secretary of State in accordance with the Rules of the House. | |
2010-06-17 | Signed by the President of the Senate. | |
2010-06-16 | Enrolled and signed by the Speaker of the House. | |
2010-06-15 | Received from the Senate without amendments. | |
2010-06-15 | Read by title and concurred in by a vote of 29 yeas and 1 nays. Ordered returned to the House. | |
2010-06-15 | Rules suspended. Called from the calendar. | |
2010-06-14 | Read by title and returned to the Calendar, subject to call. | |
2010-06-14 | Rules suspended | |
2010-06-11 | Reported without Legislative Bureau amendments. Read by title and passed to third reading and final passage. | |
2010-06-11 | Read by title and referred to the Legislative Bureau. | |
2010-06-11 | Rules suspended | |
2010-06-10 | Reported favorably. | |
2010-06-08 | Received in the Senate. Rules suspended. Read first and second time by title and referred to the Committee on Revenue and Fiscal Affairs. | |
2010-06-08 | Read by title, amended, roll called on final consideration, yeas 66, nays 18. The resolution was adopted and ordered to the Senate. | |
2010-06-07 | Scheduled for floor debate on 6/8/2010. | |
2010-06-07 | Rules suspended, read by title, amended, ordered engrossed, passed to 3rd reading. | |
2010-06-07 | Reported with amendments (10-0). | |
2010-06-04 | Read by title, referred to the Committee on Ways and Means. | |
2010-06-03 | Read by title. Lies over under the rules. |