LA HCR20 | 2019 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 8-3)
Status: Passed on April 22 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-04-22 - Enrolled and signed by the Speaker of the House.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]

Summary

Memorializes congress to consider eliminating the Windfall Elimination Provision (WEP) and the Government Pension Offset (GPO) Social Security benefit reductions

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Memorializes congress to consider eliminating the Windfall Elimination Provision (WEP) and the Government Pension Offset (GPO) Social Security benefit reductions

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2019-04-16 - Senate - Senate Vote on HCR 20 ADOPT (#62) (Y: 35 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2019-04-22HouseEnrolled and signed by the Speaker of the House.
2019-04-16HouseReceived from the Senate without amendments.
2019-04-16SenateRead by title and concurred in by a vote of 35 yeas and 0 nays. Ordered returned to the House.
2019-04-15SenateReported favorably.
2019-04-10SenateRead second time by title and referred to the Committee on Retirement.
2019-04-09SenateReceived in the Senate. Read first time by title and placed on the Calendar for a second reading.
2019-04-09HouseRead by title, rules suspended, adopted, ordered to the Senate.

Subjects


Louisiana State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback