LA HCR20 | 2010 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 19-5)
Status: Passed on June 9 2010 - 100% progression
Action: 2010-06-10 - Taken by the Clerk of the House and presented to the Secretary of State in accordance with the Rules of the House.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 19-5)
Status: Passed on June 9 2010 - 100% progression
Action: 2010-06-10 - Taken by the Clerk of the House and presented to the Secretary of State in accordance with the Rules of the House.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Requests the State Board of Elementary and Secondary Education to make changes to the Minimum Foundation Program formula beginning with the formula adopted for the 2010-2011 school year
Title
Requests the State Board of Elementary and Secondary Education to make changes to the Minimum Foundation Program formula beginning with the formula adopted for the 2010-2011 school year
Sponsors
Roll Calls
Senate - Senate Vote on HCR 20, ADOPT (#1084) (Y: 35 N: 0 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2010-06-10 | Taken by the Clerk of the House and presented to the Secretary of State in accordance with the Rules of the House. | |
2010-06-09 | Signed by the President of the Senate. | |
2010-06-09 | Enrolled and signed by the Speaker of the House. | |
2010-06-08 | Received from the Senate without amendments. | |
2010-06-08 | Read by title and concurred in by a vote of 35 yeas and 0 nays. Ordered returned to the House. | |
2010-06-07 | Reported favorably. | |
2010-05-18 | Received in the Senate. Rules suspended. Read first and second time by title and referred to the Committee on Education. | |
2010-05-18 | Read by title, adopted, ordered to the Senate. | |
2010-05-13 | Scheduled for floor debate on May 18, 2010. | |
2010-05-13 | Read by title, ordered engrossed, passed to 3rd reading. | |
2010-05-12 | Reported favorably (12-1). | |
2010-03-30 | Read by title, referred to the Committee on Education. | |
2010-03-29 | Read by title. Lies over under the rules. |