LA HCR196 | 2010 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on May 27 2010 - 100% progression
Action: 2010-06-02 - Taken by the Clerk of the House and presented to the Secretary of State in accordance with the Rules of the House.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on May 27 2010 - 100% progression
Action: 2010-06-02 - Taken by the Clerk of the House and presented to the Secretary of State in accordance with the Rules of the House.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Urges and requests a study of the means by which the La. State Board of Nursing may obtain access to investigative records
Title
Urges and requests a study of the means by which the La. State Board of Nursing may obtain access to investigative records
Sponsors
Sen. Fred Mills [R] |
Roll Calls
Senate - Senate Vote on HCR 196, ADOPT (#810) (Y: 26 N: 0 NV: 13 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2010-06-02 | Taken by the Clerk of the House and presented to the Secretary of State in accordance with the Rules of the House. | |
2010-06-01 | Signed by the President of the Senate. | |
2010-05-27 | Enrolled and signed by the Speaker of the House. | |
2010-05-26 | Received from the Senate without amendments. | |
2010-05-25 | Received in the Senate; read by title. Rules suspended. Read second time by title and concurred in by a vote of 26 yeas and 0 nays. Ordered returned to the House. | |
2010-05-25 | Read by title, rules suspended, adopted, ordered to the Senate. |