LA HCR186 | 2010 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Passed on May 25 2010 - 100% progression
Action: 2010-06-02 - Taken by the Clerk of the House and presented to the Secretary of State in accordance with the Rules of the House.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Passed on May 25 2010 - 100% progression
Action: 2010-06-02 - Taken by the Clerk of the House and presented to the Secretary of State in accordance with the Rules of the House.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Commends Kleinpeter Farms Dairy for its contributions to the state's economy, its environmental stewardship, and its community service
Title
Commends Kleinpeter Farms Dairy for its contributions to the state's economy, its environmental stewardship, and its community service
Sponsors
Roll Calls
Senate - Senate Vote on HCR 186, ADOPT (#733) (Y: 37 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2010-06-02 | Taken by the Clerk of the House and presented to the Secretary of State in accordance with the Rules of the House. | |
2010-06-01 | Signed by the President of the Senate. | |
2010-05-25 | Enrolled and signed by the Speaker of the House. | |
2010-05-24 | Received from the Senate without amendments. | |
2010-05-24 | Received in the Senate; read by title. Rules suspended. Read second time by title and concurred in by a vote of 37 yeas and 0 nays. Ordered returned to the House. | |
2010-05-24 | Read by title, rules suspended, adopted, ordered to the Senate. |