LA HCR17 | 2019 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on April 10 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-04-22 - Taken by the Clerk of the House and presented to the Secretary of State in accordance with the Rules of the House.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]

Summary

Designates June 2019 as Post-traumatic Stress Injury Awareness Month and June 27, 2019, as Post-traumatic Stress Injury Awareness Day in Louisiana

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Designates June 2019 as Post-traumatic Stress Injury Awareness Month and June 27, 2019, as Post-traumatic Stress Injury Awareness Day in Louisiana

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2019-04-10 - Senate - Senate Vote on HCR 17 ADOPT (#35) (Y: 31 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 8) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2019-04-22HouseTaken by the Clerk of the House and presented to the Secretary of State in accordance with the Rules of the House.
2019-04-16SenateSigned by the President of the Senate.
2019-04-10HouseEnrolled and signed by the Speaker of the House.
2019-04-10HouseReceived from the Senate without amendments.
2019-04-10SenateRead by title and concurred in by a vote of 31 yeas and 0 nays. Ordered returned to the House.
2019-04-09SenateReceived in the Senate. Read first time by title and placed on the Calendar for a second reading.
2019-04-09HouseRead by title, rules suspended, adopted, ordered to the Senate.

Subjects


Louisiana State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback