LA HCR17 | 2017 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 18-6-1)
Status: Passed on May 31 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-06-01 - Taken by the Clerk of the House and presented to the Secretary of State in accordance with the Rules of the House.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 18-6-1)
Status: Passed on May 31 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-06-01 - Taken by the Clerk of the House and presented to the Secretary of State in accordance with the Rules of the House.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Requests a study and recommendations concerning reporting of child abuse and neglect in military families
Title
Requests a study and recommendations concerning reporting of child abuse and neglect in military families
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2017-05-30 - Senate - Senate Vote on HCR 17 ADOPT (#520) (Y: 38 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-04-27 - House - House Vote on HCR 17 FINAL CONSIDERATION (#72) (Y: 97 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 7) [PASS]
2017-04-27 - House - House Vote on HCR 17 FINAL CONSIDERATION (#72) (Y: 97 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 7) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-06-01 | House | Taken by the Clerk of the House and presented to the Secretary of State in accordance with the Rules of the House. |
2017-05-31 | Senate | Signed by the President of the Senate. |
2017-05-31 | House | Enrolled and signed by the Speaker of the House. |
2017-05-30 | House | Received from the Senate without amendments. |
2017-05-30 | Senate | Read by title and concurred in by a vote of 38 yeas and 0 nays. Ordered returned to the House. |
2017-05-24 | Senate | Reported favorably. |
2017-05-02 | Senate | Read second time by title and referred to the Committee on Health and Welfare. |
2017-05-01 | Senate | Received in the Senate. Read first time by title and placed on the Calendar for a second reading. |
2017-04-27 | House | Read by title, roll called on final consideration, yeas 97, nays 0. The resolution was adopted and ordered to the Senate. |
2017-04-26 | House | Scheduled for floor debate on 04/27/17. |
2017-04-20 | House | Read by title, ordered engrossed, passed to 3rd reading. |
2017-04-19 | House | Reported favorably (13-0). |
2017-04-11 | House | Read by title, under the rules, referred to the Committee on Health and Welfare. |
2017-04-10 | House | Read by title. Lies over under the rules. |