LA HCR16 | 2020 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 25-5)
Status: Passed on May 7 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-05-18 - Taken by the Clerk of the House and presented to the Secretary of State in accordance with the Rules of the House.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]

Summary

Commends Madame Chief Justice Bernette Joshua Johnson of the Louisiana Supreme Court on her retirement

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Commends Madame Chief Justice Bernette Joshua Johnson of the Louisiana Supreme Court on her retirement

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2020-05-04 - Senate - Senate Vote on HCR 16 CO-AUTHORS (#49) (Y: 29 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 10) [PASS]
2020-05-04 - Senate - Senate Vote on HCR 16 ADOPT (#48) (Y: 29 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 10) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2020-05-18HouseTaken by the Clerk of the House and presented to the Secretary of State in accordance with the Rules of the House.
2020-05-11SenateSigned by the President of the Senate.
2020-05-07HouseEnrolled and signed by the Speaker of the House.
2020-05-07HouseReceived from the Senate without amendments.
2020-05-04SenateRead by title and concurred in by a vote of 29 yeas and 0 nays. Ordered returned to the House.
2020-03-16SenateReceived in the Senate. Read first time by title and placed on the Calendar for a second reading.
2020-03-12HouseRead by title, rules suspended, adopted, ordered to the Senate.

Subjects


Louisiana State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback