LA HCR15 | 2023 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 15-3-1)
Status: Passed on May 31 2023 - 100% progression
Action: 2023-06-01 - Taken by the Clerk of the House and presented to the Secretary of State in accordance with the Rules of the House.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]

Summary

Expresses recognition and encouragement of the economic ties and friendship between the state of Louisiana and the Republic of China (Taiwan)

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Expresses recognition and encouragement of the economic ties and friendship between the state of Louisiana and the Republic of China (Taiwan)

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2023-05-26 - Senate - Senate Vote on HCR 15 CONCUR (#457) (Y: 35 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2023-05-17 - House - House Vote on HCR 15 FINAL CONSIDERATION (#468) (Y: 96 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 9) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2023-06-01HouseTaken by the Clerk of the House and presented to the Secretary of State in accordance with the Rules of the House.
2023-05-31SenateSigned by the President of the Senate.
2023-05-31HouseEnrolled and signed by the Speaker of the House.
2023-05-30HouseReceived from the Senate without amendments.
2023-05-26SenateRead by title and concurred in by a vote of 35 yeas and 0 nays. Ordered returned to the House.
2023-05-24SenateReported favorably.
2023-05-18SenateRead second time by title and referred to the Committee on Commerce, Consumer Protection and International Affairs.
2023-05-17SenateReceived in the Senate. Read first time by title and placed on the Calendar for a second reading.
2023-05-17HouseRead by title, roll called on final consideration, yeas 96, nays 0. The resolution was adopted and ordered to the Senate.
2023-05-11HouseScheduled for floor debate on 05/17/2023.
2023-05-09HouseRead by title, ordered engrossed, passed to 3rd reading.
2023-05-08HouseReported favorably (9-0).
2023-04-11HouseRead by title, under the rules, referred to the Committee on Commerce.
2023-04-10HouseRead by title. Lies over under the rules.

Subjects


Louisiana State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback