LA HCR14 | 2021 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on April 12 2021 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2021-05-24 - Read by title, returned to the calendar.
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on April 12 2021 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2021-05-24 - Read by title, returned to the calendar.
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
Recognizes the Butte Tribe of Bayou Bourbeaux as an Indian tribe of the state
Title
Recognizes the Butte Tribe of Bayou Bourbeaux as an Indian tribe of the state
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-05-24 | House | Read by title, returned to the calendar. |
2021-05-20 | House | Scheduled for floor debate on 05/24/2021. |
2021-05-13 | House | Read by title, ordered engrossed, passed to 3rd reading. |
2021-05-12 | House | Reported favorably (10-0). |
2021-04-13 | House | Read by title, under the rules, referred to the Committee on House and Governmental Affairs. |
2021-04-12 | House | Read by title. Lies over under the rules. |