LA HCR129 | 2022 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 5-1)
Status: Passed on June 3 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-06-08 - Taken by the Clerk of the House and presented to the Secretary of State in accordance with the Rules of the House.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 5-1)
Status: Passed on June 3 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-06-08 - Taken by the Clerk of the House and presented to the Secretary of State in accordance with the Rules of the House.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Requests a study concerning improving conditions regarding line-of-sight issues caused by columns in legislative committee rooms in the state capitol building
Title
Requests a study concerning improving conditions regarding line-of-sight issues caused by columns in legislative committee rooms in the state capitol building
Sponsors
Rep. Raymond Crews [R] | Rep. Daryl Deshotel [R] | Rep. Larry Frieman [R] | Sen. Alan Seabaugh [R] |
Rep. Francis Thompson [R] | Rep. Matthew Willard [D] |
Roll Calls
2022-06-03 - Senate - Senate Vote on HCR 129 CONCUR (#1262) (Y: 34 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2022-06-02 - House - House Vote on HCR 129 FINAL CONSIDERATION (#1360) (Y: 84 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 19) [PASS]
2022-06-02 - House - House Vote on HCR 129 FINAL CONSIDERATION (#1360) (Y: 84 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 19) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-06-08 | House | Taken by the Clerk of the House and presented to the Secretary of State in accordance with the Rules of the House. |
2022-06-05 | Senate | Signed by the President of the Senate. |
2022-06-03 | House | Enrolled and signed by the Speaker of the House. |
2022-06-03 | House | Received from the Senate without amendments. |
2022-06-03 | Senate | Read by title and concurred in by a vote of 34 yeas and 0 nays. Ordered returned to the House. |
2022-06-02 | Senate | Received in the Senate. Rules suspended. Read first time by title and placed on the Calendar for a second reading. |
2022-06-02 | House | Read by title, roll called on final consideration, yeas 84, nays 2. The resolution was adopted and ordered to the Senate. |
2022-06-01 | House | Scheduled for floor debate on 06/02/2022. |
2022-06-01 | House | Read by title, ordered engrossed, passed to 3rd reading. |
2022-05-31 | House | Reported favorably (12-0). |
2022-05-24 | House | Read by title, under the rules, referred to the Committee on House and Governmental Affairs. |
2022-05-23 | House | Read by title. Lies over under the rules. |