LA HCR129 | 2021 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 22-3)
Status: Passed on June 10 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-06-14 - Taken by the Clerk of the House and presented to the Secretary of State in accordance with the Rules of the House.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]

Summary

Commends the Louisiana State University at Eunice baseball team on winning the National Junior College Athletic Association 2021 Division II National Championship

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Commends the Louisiana State University at Eunice baseball team on winning the National Junior College Athletic Association 2021 Division II National Championship

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2021-06-10 - Senate - Senate Vote on HCR 129 CONCUR (#1125) (Y: 37 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2021-06-14HouseTaken by the Clerk of the House and presented to the Secretary of State in accordance with the Rules of the House.
2021-06-10SenateSigned by the President of the Senate on 6/11/2021.
2021-06-10HouseEnrolled and signed by the Speaker of the House.
2021-06-10HouseReceived from the Senate without amendments.
2021-06-10SenateReceived in the Senate; read by title. Rules suspended. Read second time by title and concurred in by a vote of 37 yeas and 0 nays. Ordered returned to the House.
2021-06-09HouseRead by title, rules suspended, adopted, ordered to the Senate.
2021-06-08HouseRead by title. Lies over under the rules.

Subjects


Louisiana State Sources


Bill Comments 750

feedback