LA HCR116 | 2022 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on May 18 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-05-24 - Taken by the Clerk of the House and presented to the Secretary of State in accordance with the Rules of the House.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on May 18 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-05-24 - Taken by the Clerk of the House and presented to the Secretary of State in accordance with the Rules of the House.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Commends Louisiana Department of Wildlife and Fisheries Sergeant Stephen Rhodes for his heroism
Title
Commends Louisiana Department of Wildlife and Fisheries Sergeant Stephen Rhodes for his heroism
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2022-05-17 - Senate - Senate Vote on HCR 116 CO-AUTHORS (#645) (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 25) [PASS]
2022-05-17 - Senate - Senate Vote on HCR 116 CONCUR (#644) (Y: 37 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2022-05-17 - Senate - Senate Vote on HCR 116 CONCUR (#644) (Y: 37 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-05-24 | House | Taken by the Clerk of the House and presented to the Secretary of State in accordance with the Rules of the House. |
2022-05-19 | Senate | Signed by the President of the Senate. |
2022-05-18 | House | Enrolled and signed by the Speaker of the House. |
2022-05-17 | House | Received from the Senate without amendments. |
2022-05-17 | Senate | Read by title and concurred in by a vote of 37 yeas and 0 nays. Ordered returned to the House. |
2022-05-16 | Senate | Received in the Senate. Read first time by title and placed on the Calendar for a second reading. |
2022-05-16 | House | Read by title, rules suspended, adopted, ordered to the Senate. |