LA HCR11 | 2022 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 76-30-2)
Status: Passed on May 23 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-05-26 - Taken by the Clerk of the House and presented to the Secretary of State in accordance with the Rules of the House.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 76-30-2)
Status: Passed on May 23 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-05-26 - Taken by the Clerk of the House and presented to the Secretary of State in accordance with the Rules of the House.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Provides relative to the Government Pension Offset and Windfall Elimination Provision
Title
Provides relative to the Government Pension Offset and Windfall Elimination Provision
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2022-05-19 - House - House Vote on HCR 11 CONCUR IN SENATE AMENDMENTS (#987) (Y: 88 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 17) [PASS]
2022-05-11 - Senate - Senate Vote on HCR 11 CONCUR (#511) (Y: 35 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2022-05-11 - Senate - Senate Vote on HCR 11 CO-AUTHORS (#512) (Y: 21 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 17) [PASS]
2022-04-18 - House - House Vote on HCR 11 FINAL CONSIDERATION (#300) (Y: 96 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 9) [PASS]
2022-05-11 - Senate - Senate Vote on HCR 11 CONCUR (#511) (Y: 35 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2022-05-11 - Senate - Senate Vote on HCR 11 CO-AUTHORS (#512) (Y: 21 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 17) [PASS]
2022-04-18 - House - House Vote on HCR 11 FINAL CONSIDERATION (#300) (Y: 96 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 9) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-05-26 | House | Taken by the Clerk of the House and presented to the Secretary of State in accordance with the Rules of the House. |
2022-05-24 | Senate | Signed by the President of the Senate. |
2022-05-23 | House | Enrolled and signed by the Speaker of the House. |
2022-05-19 | House | Read by title, roll called, yeas 88, nays 0, Senate amendments concurred in. |
2022-05-17 | House | Scheduled for concurrence on 05/19/2022. |
2022-05-11 | House | Received from the Senate with amendments. |
2022-05-11 | Senate | Senate amendments read and adopted. Read by title and concurred in by a vote of 35 yeas and 0 nays. Ordered returned to the House. |
2022-05-09 | Senate | Reported with amendments. |
2022-04-19 | Senate | Read second time by title and referred to the Committee on Retirement. |
2022-04-18 | Senate | Received in the Senate. Read first time by title and placed on the Calendar for a second reading. |
2022-04-18 | House | Read by title, roll called on final consideration, yeas 96, nays 0. The resolution was adopted and ordered to the Senate. |
2022-04-11 | House | Scheduled for floor debate on 04/18/2022. |
2022-04-11 | House | Read by title, ordered engrossed, passed to 3rd reading. |
2022-04-07 | House | Reported favorably (7-0). |
2022-03-15 | House | Read by title, under the rules, referred to the Committee on Retirement. |
2022-03-14 | House | Read by title. Lies over under the rules. |