LA HCR11 | 2021 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 28-10)
Status: Passed on May 26 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-06-01 - Taken by the Clerk of the House and presented to the Secretary of State in accordance with the Rules of the House.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]

Summary

Requests the State Board of Elementary and Secondary Education to develop a plan for providing school literacy coaches for students in kindergarten through second grade in elementary schools identified as needing improvement

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Requests the State Board of Elementary and Secondary Education to develop a plan for providing school literacy coaches for students in kindergarten through second grade in elementary schools identified as needing improvement

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2021-05-25 - House - House Vote on HCR 11 CONCUR IN SENATE AMENDMENTS (#677) (Y: 94 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 11) [PASS]
2021-05-18 - Senate - Senate Vote on HCR 11 CO-AUTHORS (#384) (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 27) [PASS]
2021-05-18 - Senate - Senate Vote on HCR 11 CONCUR (#383) (Y: 32 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 6) [PASS]
2021-04-27 - House - House Vote on HCR 11 FINAL CONSIDERATION (#77) (Y: 99 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2021-06-01HouseTaken by the Clerk of the House and presented to the Secretary of State in accordance with the Rules of the House.
2021-05-27SenateSigned by the President of the Senate.
2021-05-26HouseEnrolled and signed by the Speaker of the House.
2021-05-25HouseRead by title, roll called, yeas 94, nays 0, Senate amendments concurred in.
2021-05-20HouseScheduled for concurrence on 05/25/2021.
2021-05-18HouseReceived from the Senate with amendments.
2021-05-18SenateSenate amendments read and adopted. Read by title and concurred in by a vote of 32 yeas and 0 nays. Ordered returned to the House.
2021-05-17SenateReported with amendments.
2021-04-28SenateRead second time by title and referred to the Committee on Education.
2021-04-27SenateReceived in the Senate. Rules suspended. Read first time by title and placed on the Calendar for a second reading.
2021-04-27HouseRead by title, roll called on final consideration, yeas 99, nays 0. The resolution was adopted and ordered to the Senate.
2021-04-26HouseScheduled for floor debate on 04/27/2021.
2021-04-26HouseRead by title, ordered engrossed, passed to 3rd reading.
2021-04-22HouseReported favorably (11-0).
2021-04-13HouseRead by title, under the rules, referred to the Committee on Education.
2021-04-12HouseRead by title. Lies over under the rules.

Subjects


Louisiana State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttp://www.legis.la.gov/legis/BillInfo.aspx?s=21rs&b=HCR11&sbi=y
Texthttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1213174
Texthttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1216442
Texthttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1228144
Amendmenthttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1223828
Amendmenthttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1224628
Supplementhttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1213175
Supplementhttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1216743
Supplementhttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1224693
Supplementhttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1225888
Supplementhttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1226753
Supplementhttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1237047
Roll Callhttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1217939
Roll Callhttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1225777
Roll Callhttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1225778
Roll Callhttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1228011

Bill Comments

feedback