LA HCR108 | 2013 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on May 30 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-06-04 - Taken by the Clerk of the House and presented to the Secretary of State in accordance with the Rules of the House.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on May 30 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-06-04 - Taken by the Clerk of the House and presented to the Secretary of State in accordance with the Rules of the House.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
Requests the state and statewide public retirement systems to appear before the House and Senate committees on retirement and report relative to the promulgation and distribution of forms regarding pension forfeiture (EG NO IMPACT APV)
Title
Requests the state and statewide public retirement systems to appear before the House and Senate committees on retirement and report relative to the promulgation and distribution of forms regarding pension forfeiture (EG NO IMPACT APV)
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2013-05-29 - Senate - Senate Vote on HCR 108 CONCUR (#751) (Y: 37 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2013-06-04 | House | Taken by the Clerk of the House and presented to the Secretary of State in accordance with the Rules of the House. |
2013-06-03 | Senate | Signed by the President of the Senate. |
2013-05-30 | House | Enrolled and signed by the Speaker of the House. |
2013-05-29 | House | Received from the Senate without amendments. |
2013-05-29 | Senate | Read by title and concurred in by a vote of 37 yeas and 0 nays. Ordered returned to the House. |
2013-05-29 | Senate | Called from the Calendar. |
2013-05-28 | Senate | Read by title and returned to the Calendar, subject to call. |
2013-05-28 | Senate | Rules suspended. Recalled from Committee. |
2013-05-27 | Senate | Read second time by title and referred to the Committee on Retirement. |
2013-05-23 | Senate | Received in the Senate. Rules suspended. Read first time by title and placed on the Calendar for a second reading. |
2013-05-23 | House | Read by title, adopted, ordered to the Senate. |
2013-05-21 | House | Scheduled for floor debate on May 23, 2013. |
2013-05-16 | House | Read by title, amended, ordered engrossed, passed to 3rd reading. |
2013-05-15 | House | Reported with amendments (8-0). |
2013-05-07 | House | Read by title, under the rules, referred to the Committee on Retirement. |
2013-05-06 | House | Read by title. Lies over under the rules. |