LA HCR101 | 2021 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on June 8 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-06-09 - Taken by the Clerk of the House and presented to the Secretary of State in accordance with the Rules of the House.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on June 8 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-06-09 - Taken by the Clerk of the House and presented to the Secretary of State in accordance with the Rules of the House.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Creates a commission to study the procedures for processing felony sentences and calculating incarceration release dates of persons in the custody of the Department of Public Safety and Corrections
Title
Creates a commission to study the procedures for processing felony sentences and calculating incarceration release dates of persons in the custody of the Department of Public Safety and Corrections
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2021-06-06 - Senate - Senate Vote on HCR 101 CONCUR (#797) (Y: 36 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2021-05-27 - House - House Vote on HCR 101 FINAL CONSIDERATION (#842) (Y: 101 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2021-05-27 - House - House Vote on HCR 101 FINAL CONSIDERATION (#842) (Y: 101 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-06-09 | House | Taken by the Clerk of the House and presented to the Secretary of State in accordance with the Rules of the House. |
2021-06-09 | Senate | Signed by the President of the Senate. |
2021-06-08 | House | Enrolled and signed by the Speaker of the House. |
2021-06-07 | House | Received from the Senate without amendments. |
2021-06-06 | Senate | Read by title and concurred in by a vote of 36 yeas and 0 nays. Ordered returned to the House. |
2021-06-03 | Senate | Rules suspended. Reported favorably. |
2021-06-01 | Senate | Read second time by title and referred to the Committee on Judiciary C. |
2021-05-27 | Senate | Received in the Senate. Rules suspended. Read first time by title and placed on the Calendar for a second reading. |
2021-05-27 | House | Read by title, amended, roll called on final consideration, yeas 101, nays 0. The resolution was adopted and ordered to the Senate. |
2021-05-27 | House | Called from the calendar. |
2021-05-27 | House | Read by title, returned to the calendar. |
2021-05-26 | House | Scheduled for floor debate on 05/27/2021. |
2021-05-26 | House | Read by title, passed to 3rd reading. |
2021-05-26 | House | Discharged from the Committee on House and Governmental Affairs. |
2021-05-26 | House | Read by title, ordered engrossed, recommitted to the Committee on House and Governmental Affairs. |
2021-05-25 | House | Reported favorably (8-0). To be recommitted to the Committee on House and Governmental Affairs. |
2021-05-24 | House | Read by title, under the rules, referred to the Committee on Administration of Criminal Justice. |
2021-05-20 | House | Read by title. Lies over under the rules. |