LA HCR1 | 2019 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-1)
Status: Introduced on March 18 2019 - 25% progression
Action: 2019-06-03 - Read by title, returned to the calendar.
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]

Summary

Provides for legislative approval of the MFP formula for the 2019-2020 school year (EG +$145,214,142 GF EX See Note)

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Provides for legislative approval of the MFP formula for the 2019-2020 school year (EG +$145,214,142 GF EX See Note)

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2019-06-03HouseRead by title, returned to the calendar.
2019-06-02HouseMade Special Order of the day No. 1 for 06/03/19.
2019-06-02HouseRead by title, rules suspended, passed to 3rd reading.
2019-06-02HouseReported favorably (23-0).
2019-05-31HouseRead by title, ordered engrossed, recommitted to the Committee on Appropriations.
2019-05-30HouseReported favorably (14-0). To be recommitted to the Committee on Appropriations.
2019-04-08HouseRead by title, under the rules, referred to the Committee on Education.
2019-03-22HouseFirst appeared in the Interim Calendar on 3/22/2019.
2019-03-18HouseUnder the rules, provisionally referred to the Committee on Education.
2019-03-18HousePrefiled.

Subjects


Louisiana State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback