LA HCR1 | 2018 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on May 10 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-05-15 - Taken by the Clerk of the House and presented to the Secretary of State in accordance with the Rules of the House.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]

Summary

Creates the Sanitary Sewer Systems Overflows Commission

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Creates the Sanitary Sewer Systems Overflows Commission

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2018-05-09 - Senate - Senate Vote on HCR 1 ADOPT (#901) (Y: 31 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 8) [PASS]
2018-04-26 - House - House Vote on HCR 1 FINAL CONSIDERATION (#581) (Y: 84 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 21) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2018-05-15HouseTaken by the Clerk of the House and presented to the Secretary of State in accordance with the Rules of the House.
2018-05-11SenateSigned by the President of the Senate.
2018-05-10HouseEnrolled and signed by the Speaker of the House.
2018-05-09HouseReceived from the Senate without amendments.
2018-05-09SenateRead by title and concurred in by a vote of 31 yeas and 0 nays. Ordered returned to the House.
2018-05-08SenateRules suspended. Reported favorably.
2018-05-01SenateRead second time by title and referred to the Committee on Environmental Quality.
2018-04-30SenateReceived in the Senate. Read first time by title and placed on the Calendar for a second reading.
2018-04-26HouseRead by title, roll called on final consideration, yeas 84, nays 0. The resolution was adopted and ordered to the Senate.
2018-04-19HouseScheduled for floor debate on 04/26/18.
2018-04-18HouseRead by title, amended, ordered engrossed, passed to 3rd reading.
2018-04-17HouseReported with amendments (8-0).
2018-04-05HouseRead by title, ordered engrossed, recommitted to the Committee on House and Governmental Affairs.
2018-04-04HouseReported with amendments (16-0) To be recommitted to the Committee on House and Governmental Affairs.
2018-03-13HouseRead by title, under the rules, referred to the Committee on Natural Resources and Environment.
2018-03-12HouseRead by title. Lies over under the rules.
2018-02-02HouseFirst appeared in the Interim Calendar on 2/2/2018.
2018-01-29HouseUnder the rules, provisionally referred to the Committee on Natural Resources and Environment.
2018-01-29HousePrefiled.

Subjects


Louisiana State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttp://www.legis.la.gov/legis/BillInfo.aspx?s=18rs&b=HCR1&sbi=y
Texthttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1061746
Texthttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1082815
Texthttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1087362
Texthttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1094855
Amendmenthttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1080863
Amendmenthttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1082768
Amendmenthttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1087350
Supplementhttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1061747
Supplementhttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1082899
Supplementhttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1087653
Roll Callhttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1090844
Roll Callhttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1094806

Bill Comments

feedback