LA HCR1 | 2018 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on May 10 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-05-15 - Taken by the Clerk of the House and presented to the Secretary of State in accordance with the Rules of the House.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on May 10 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-05-15 - Taken by the Clerk of the House and presented to the Secretary of State in accordance with the Rules of the House.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Creates the Sanitary Sewer Systems Overflows Commission
Title
Creates the Sanitary Sewer Systems Overflows Commission
Sponsors
Rep. Paul Hollis [R] |
Roll Calls
2018-05-09 - Senate - Senate Vote on HCR 1 ADOPT (#901) (Y: 31 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 8) [PASS]
2018-04-26 - House - House Vote on HCR 1 FINAL CONSIDERATION (#581) (Y: 84 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 21) [PASS]
2018-04-26 - House - House Vote on HCR 1 FINAL CONSIDERATION (#581) (Y: 84 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 21) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-05-15 | House | Taken by the Clerk of the House and presented to the Secretary of State in accordance with the Rules of the House. |
2018-05-11 | Senate | Signed by the President of the Senate. |
2018-05-10 | House | Enrolled and signed by the Speaker of the House. |
2018-05-09 | House | Received from the Senate without amendments. |
2018-05-09 | Senate | Read by title and concurred in by a vote of 31 yeas and 0 nays. Ordered returned to the House. |
2018-05-08 | Senate | Rules suspended. Reported favorably. |
2018-05-01 | Senate | Read second time by title and referred to the Committee on Environmental Quality. |
2018-04-30 | Senate | Received in the Senate. Read first time by title and placed on the Calendar for a second reading. |
2018-04-26 | House | Read by title, roll called on final consideration, yeas 84, nays 0. The resolution was adopted and ordered to the Senate. |
2018-04-19 | House | Scheduled for floor debate on 04/26/18. |
2018-04-18 | House | Read by title, amended, ordered engrossed, passed to 3rd reading. |
2018-04-17 | House | Reported with amendments (8-0). |
2018-04-05 | House | Read by title, ordered engrossed, recommitted to the Committee on House and Governmental Affairs. |
2018-04-04 | House | Reported with amendments (16-0) To be recommitted to the Committee on House and Governmental Affairs. |
2018-03-13 | House | Read by title, under the rules, referred to the Committee on Natural Resources and Environment. |
2018-03-12 | House | Read by title. Lies over under the rules. |
2018-02-02 | House | First appeared in the Interim Calendar on 2/2/2018. |
2018-01-29 | House | Under the rules, provisionally referred to the Committee on Natural Resources and Environment. |
2018-01-29 | House | Prefiled. |