LA HCR1 | 2017 | 1st Special Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on February 22 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-02-24 - Taken by the Clerk of the House and presented to the Secretary of State in accordance with the Rules of the House.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]

Summary

Directs the treasurer to immediately begin implementation of the process to allocate money deposited into the state treasury from constitutional and statutory dedications that flow through the Bond Security and Redemption Fund for the purpose of paying state debt

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Directs the treasurer to immediately begin implementation of the process to allocate money deposited into the state treasury from constitutional and statutory dedications that flow through the Bond Security and Redemption Fund for the purpose of paying state debt

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2017-02-22 - House - House Vote on HCR 1 CONCUR IN SENATE AMENDMENTS (#44) (Y: 97 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2017-02-22 - Senate - Senate Vote on HCR 1 FINAL PASSAGE (#60) (Y: 29 N: 7 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2017-02-19 - House - House Vote on HCR 1 FINAL CONSIDERATION (#26) (Y: 81 N: 14 NV: 0 Abs: 7) [PASS]
2017-02-19 - House - House Vote on HCR 1 AMENDMENT # 169 BY CARTER G. MOTION TO ADOPT (#25) (Y: 38 N: 58 NV: 0 Abs: 6) [FAIL]
2017-02-19 - House - House Vote on HCR 1 AMENDMENT # 164 BY LANDRY T. MOTION TO ADOPT (#24) (Y: 39 N: 54 NV: 0 Abs: 9) [FAIL]
2017-02-19 - House - House Vote on HCR 1 AMENDMENT # 162 BY THIBAUT MOTION TO ADOPT (#23) (Y: 34 N: 59 NV: 0 Abs: 9) [FAIL]
2017-02-19 - House - House Vote on HCR 1 AMENDMENT # 163 BY SMITH MOTION TO ADOPT (#22) (Y: 38 N: 55 NV: 0 Abs: 9) [FAIL]
2017-02-19 - House - House Vote on HCR 1 AMENDMENT # 158 BY REYNOLDS MOTION TO ADOPT (#21) (Y: 39 N: 56 NV: 0 Abs: 7) [FAIL]

History

DateChamberAction
2017-02-24HouseTaken by the Clerk of the House and presented to the Secretary of State in accordance with the Rules of the House.
2017-02-22SenateSigned by the President of the Senate.
2017-02-22HouseEnrolled and signed by the Speaker of the House.
2017-02-22HouseRead by title, roll called, yeas 97, nays 1, Senate amendments concurred in.
2017-02-22HouseRules suspended.
2017-02-22HouseReceived from the Senate with amendments.
2017-02-22SenateSenate floor amendments read and adopted. Read by title, passed by a vote of 29 yeas and 7 nays, and ordered returned to the House. Motion to reconsider tabled.
2017-02-21SenateReported without Legislative Bureau amendments. Read by title and passed to third reading and final passage.
2017-02-21SenateReported with amendments. Rules suspended. Committee amendments read and adopted. Read by title and referred to the Legislative Bureau.
2017-02-20SenateRead second time by title and referred to the Committee on Finance.
2017-02-19SenateReceived in the Senate. Rules suspended. Read first time by title and placed on the Calendar for a second reading.
2017-02-19HouseRead by title, amended, roll called on final consideration, yeas 81, nays 14. The resolution was adopted and ordered to the Senate.
2017-02-17HouseScheduled for floor debate on 02/19/17.
2017-02-17HouseRead by title, ordered engrossed, passed to 3rd reading.
2017-02-16HouseReported favorably (21-2).
2017-02-15HouseRead by title, rules suspended, referred to the Committee on Appropriations.

Subjects


Louisiana State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttp://www.legis.la.gov/legis/BillInfo.aspx?s=171ES&b=HCR1&sbi=y
Texthttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1021821
Texthttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1021932
Texthttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1022368
Texthttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1022851
Amendmenthttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1022034
Amendmenthttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1022293
Amendmenthttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1022294
Amendmenthttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1022297
Amendmenthttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1022298
Amendmenthttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1022300
Amendmenthttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1022340
Amendmenthttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1022326
Amendmenthttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1022292
Roll Callhttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1022348
Roll Callhttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1022346
Roll Callhttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1022338
Roll Callhttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1022337
Roll Callhttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1022335
Amendmenthttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1022649
Amendmenthttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1022789
Amendmenthttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1022671
Roll Callhttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1022822
Supplementhttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1021822
Supplementhttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1021983
Supplementhttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1022425
Supplementhttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1022656
Roll Callhttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1022412
Roll Callhttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1022805

Bill Comments

feedback