LA HB99 | 2018 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on February 21 2018 - 25% progression
Action: 2018-04-19 - Scheduled for floor debate on 04/25/18.
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]

Summary

Provides for the Louisiana Complete Count Committee (EG INCREASE GF EX See Note)

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Provides for the Louisiana Complete Count Committee (EG INCREASE GF EX See Note)

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2018-04-19HouseScheduled for floor debate on 04/25/18.
2018-04-18HouseRead by title, amended, ordered engrossed, passed to 3rd reading.
2018-04-17HouseReported with amendments (8-0).
2018-03-12HouseRead by title, rules suspended, referred to the Committee on House and Governmental Affairs.
2018-02-23HouseFirst appeared in the Interim Calendar on 2/23/2018.
2018-02-21HouseUnder the rules, provisionally referred to the Committee on House and Governmental Affairs.
2018-02-21HousePrefiled.

Subjects


Louisiana State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback