LA HB976 | 2010 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 3-0)
Status: Passed on June 29 2010 - 100% progression
Action: 2010-06-29 - Effective date: August 15, 2010.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 3-0)
Status: Passed on June 29 2010 - 100% progression
Action: 2010-06-29 - Effective date: August 15, 2010.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
Provides with respect to the New Orleans International Airport Sales Tax District
Title
Provides with respect to the New Orleans International Airport Sales Tax District
Sponsors
Roll Calls
House - House Vote on HB 976, CONCUR IN SENATE AMENDMENTS (#1653) (Y: 93 N: 0 NV: 12 Abs: 0) [PASS]
Senate - Senate Vote on HB 976, FINAL PASSAGE (#1428) (Y: 31 N: 0 NV: 8 Abs: 0) [PASS]
House - House Vote on HB 976, FINAL PASSAGE (#767) (Y: 86 N: 0 NV: 17 Abs: 0) [PASS]
Senate - Senate Vote on HB 976, FINAL PASSAGE (#1428) (Y: 31 N: 0 NV: 8 Abs: 0) [PASS]
House - House Vote on HB 976, FINAL PASSAGE (#767) (Y: 86 N: 0 NV: 17 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2010-06-29 | Effective date: August 15, 2010. | |
2010-06-29 | Signed by the Governor. Becomes Act No. 723. | |
2010-06-18 | Sent to the Governor for executive approval. | |
2010-06-17 | Signed by the President of the Senate. | |
2010-06-17 | Enrolled and signed by the Speaker of the House. | |
2010-06-16 | Read by title, roll called, yeas 93, nays 0, Senate amendments concurred in. | |
2010-06-15 | Scheduled for floor debate on 6/16/2010. | |
2010-06-14 | Received from the Senate with amendments. | |
2010-06-11 | Rules suspended. Senate floor amendments were read and adopted. The amended bill was read by title, finally passed by a vote of 31 yeas and 0 nays, and ordered returned to the House. Motion to reconsider tabled. | |
2010-06-09 | Reported without Legislative Bureau amendments. Read by title and passed to third reading and final passage. | |
2010-06-08 | Committee amendments read and adopted. Read by title and referred to the Legislative Bureau. | |
2010-06-07 | Reported with amendments. | |
2010-05-17 | Read second time by title and referred to the Committee on Local and Municipal Affairs. | |
2010-05-13 | Received in the Senate. Read first time by title and placed on the Calendar for a second reading. | |
2010-05-12 | Read third time by title, amended, roll called on final passage, yeas 86, nays 0. Finally passed, title adopted, ordered to the Senate. | |
2010-05-07 | Scheduled for floor debate on May 12, 2010. | |
2010-05-05 | Read by title, amended, ordered engrossed, passed to 3rd reading - regular calendar. | |
2010-05-04 | Reported with amendments (11-0) (Regular). | |
2010-04-06 | Read by title, referred to the Committee on Municipal, Parochial and Cultural Affairs. | |
2010-04-05 | Read by title. | |
2010-03-19 | First appeared in the Interim Calendar on 3/19/2010. | |
2010-03-19 | Prefiled. To be introduced at a later date. |