LA HB970 | 2022 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on April 5 2022 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2022-05-04 - Read by title, ordered engrossed, recommitted to the Committee on Appropriations.
Pending: House Appropriations Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on April 5 2022 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2022-05-04 - Read by title, ordered engrossed, recommitted to the Committee on Appropriations.
Pending: House Appropriations Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
Creates an early childhood literacy program for the purpose of delivering an age-appropriate book monthly to eligible children under the age of five (EG INCREASE GF EX See Note)
Title
Creates an early childhood literacy program for the purpose of delivering an age-appropriate book monthly to eligible children under the age of five (EG INCREASE GF EX See Note)
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-05-04 | House | Read by title, ordered engrossed, recommitted to the Committee on Appropriations. |
2022-05-03 | House | Reported favorably (11-0). |
2022-04-06 | House | Read by title, under the rules, referred to the Committee on Education. |
2022-04-05 | House | Read by title. Lies over under the rules. |