LA HB967 | 2022 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Engrossed on May 4 2022 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2022-06-03 - Read by title and returned to the Calendar, subject to call.
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on May 4 2022 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2022-06-03 - Read by title and returned to the Calendar, subject to call.
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
Repeals a prohibition on reducing liability limits for certain costs
Title
Repeals a prohibition on reducing liability limits for certain costs
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2022-05-03 - House - House Vote on HB 967 FINAL PASSAGE (#630) (Y: 69 N: 26 NV: 0 Abs: 10) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-06-03 | Senate | Read by title and returned to the Calendar, subject to call. |
2022-05-23 | Senate | Reported with Legislative Bureau amendments which were read and adopted. Read by title and passed to third reading and final passage. |
2022-05-19 | Senate | Committee amendments read and adopted. Read by title and referred to the Legislative Bureau. |
2022-05-18 | Senate | Rules suspended. Reported with amendments. |
2022-05-09 | Senate | Read second time by title and referred to the Committee on Insurance. |
2022-05-04 | Senate | Received in the Senate. Read first time by title and placed on the Calendar for a second reading. |
2022-05-03 | House | Read third time by title, amended, roll called on final passage, yeas 69, nays 26. Finally passed, title adopted, ordered to the Senate. |
2022-05-03 | House | Called from the calendar. |
2022-04-28 | House | Scheduled for floor debate on 05/03/2022. |
2022-04-28 | House | Notice given. |
2022-04-28 | House | Read by title, returned to the calendar. |
2022-04-21 | House | Scheduled for floor debate on 04/28/2022. |
2022-04-20 | House | Read by title, ordered engrossed, passed to 3rd reading. |
2022-04-19 | House | Reported favorably (8-0). |
2022-04-06 | House | Read by title, under the rules, referred to the Committee on Insurance. |
2022-04-05 | House | Read by title. Lies over under the rules. |