LA HB955 | 2010 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on July 8 2010 - 100% progression
Action: 2010-07-08 - Effective date: July 8, 2010.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on July 8 2010 - 100% progression
Action: 2010-07-08 - Effective date: July 8, 2010.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
Provides relative to the New Orleans Redevelopment Authority
Title
Provides relative to the New Orleans Redevelopment Authority
Sponsors
Rep. Walt Leger [D] |
Roll Calls
House - House Vote on HB 955, MOTION TO ADOPT (#1976) (Y: 91 N: 0 NV: 14 Abs: 0) [PASS]
Senate - Senate Vote on HB 955, ADOPT (#2041) (Y: 34 N: 0 NV: 5 Abs: 0) [PASS]
House - House Vote on HB 955, REJECT SENATE AMENDMENTS (#1866) (Y: 100 N: 0 NV: 5 Abs: 0) [PASS]
Senate - Senate Vote on HB 955, FINAL PASSAGE (#1772) (Y: 34 N: 0 NV: 5 Abs: 0) [PASS]
House - House Vote on HB 955, FINAL PASSAGE (#1245) (Y: 92 N: 0 NV: 13 Abs: 0) [PASS]
Senate - Senate Vote on HB 955, ADOPT (#2041) (Y: 34 N: 0 NV: 5 Abs: 0) [PASS]
House - House Vote on HB 955, REJECT SENATE AMENDMENTS (#1866) (Y: 100 N: 0 NV: 5 Abs: 0) [PASS]
Senate - Senate Vote on HB 955, FINAL PASSAGE (#1772) (Y: 34 N: 0 NV: 5 Abs: 0) [PASS]
House - House Vote on HB 955, FINAL PASSAGE (#1245) (Y: 92 N: 0 NV: 13 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2010-07-08 | Effective date: July 8, 2010. | |
2010-07-08 | Signed by the Governor. Becomes Act No. 1030. | |
2010-06-23 | Sent to the Governor for executive approval. | |
2010-06-21 | Signed by the President of the Senate on 6/23. | |
2010-06-21 | Enrolled and signed by the Speaker of the House. | |
2010-06-21 | Notice House adopted the Conference Committee Report. | |
2010-06-21 | Conference Committee Report read, roll called, yeas 91, nays 0. The Conference Committee Report was adopted. | |
2010-06-21 | Notice of Senate adoption of Conference Committee Report. | |
2010-06-21 | Conference Committee Report read; adopted by a vote of 34 yeas and 0 nays. | |
2010-06-21 | Conference Committee report received. | |
2010-06-21 | Notice of Senate conferees appointed. | |
2010-06-21 | Senate conference committee members appointed: Morrell, Appel, and Murray. | |
2010-06-21 | Notice the House rejected the Senate amendments; House Conference Committee members appointed. | |
2010-06-20 | House conferees appointed: Leger, Barrow, and Arnold. | |
2010-06-20 | Read by title, roll called, yeas 100, nays 0, Senate amendments rejected, conference committee appointment pending. | |
2010-06-20 | Called from the calendar. | |
2010-06-20 | Read by title, returned to the calendar. | |
2010-06-18 | Scheduled for concurrence on 6/20/2010. | |
2010-06-17 | Received from the Senate with amendments. | |
2010-06-17 | Rules suspended. Senate floor amendments were read and adopted. The amended bill was read by title, finally passed by a vote of 34 yeas and 0 nays, and ordered returned to the House. Motion to reconsider tabled. | |
2010-06-14 | Reported with Legislative Bureau amendments which were read and adopted. Read by title and passed to third reading and final passage. | |
2010-06-11 | Committee amendments read and adopted. Read by title and referred to the Legislative Bureau. | |
2010-06-10 | Rules suspended. Reported with amendments. | |
2010-06-08 | Received in the Senate. Rules suspended. Read first and second time by title and referred to the Committee on Local and Municipal Affairs. | |
2010-06-08 | Read third time by title, roll called on final passage, yeas 92, nays 0. Finally passed, title adopted, ordered to the Senate. | |
2010-06-07 | Scheduled for floor debate on 6/8/2010. | |
2010-06-07 | Read by title, ordered engrossed, passed to 3rd reading - local and consent calendar. | |
2010-06-04 | Reported favorably (13-0) (Local and Consent). | |
2010-04-06 | Read by title, referred to the Committee on Municipal, Parochial and Cultural Affairs. | |
2010-04-05 | Read by title. | |
2010-03-19 | First appeared in the Interim Calendar on 3/19/2010. | |
2010-03-18 | Prefiled. To be introduced at a later date. |