LA HB946 | 2022 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on June 17 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-06-17 - Effective date: 08/01/2022.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on June 17 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-06-17 - Effective date: 08/01/2022.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
Provides relative to the membership and reports of special education advisory councils
Title
Provides relative to the membership and reports of special education advisory councils
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2022-06-05 - House - House Vote on HB 946 CONCUR IN SENATE AMENDMENTS (#1607) (Y: 87 N: 8 NV: 0 Abs: 10) [PASS]
2022-06-03 - Senate - Senate Vote on HB 946 FINAL PASSAGE (#1325) (Y: 30 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 8) [PASS]
2022-05-23 - House - House Vote on HB 946 FINAL PASSAGE (#1068) (Y: 94 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 11) [PASS]
2022-06-03 - Senate - Senate Vote on HB 946 FINAL PASSAGE (#1325) (Y: 30 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 8) [PASS]
2022-05-23 - House - House Vote on HB 946 FINAL PASSAGE (#1068) (Y: 94 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 11) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-06-17 | House | Effective date: 08/01/2022. |
2022-06-17 | House | Signed by the Governor. Becomes Act No. 576. |
2022-06-07 | House | Sent to the Governor for executive approval. |
2022-06-06 | Senate | Signed by the President of the Senate. |
2022-06-06 | House | Enrolled and signed by the Speaker of the House. |
2022-06-05 | House | Read by title, roll called, yeas 87, nays 8, Senate amendments concurred in. |
2022-06-03 | House | Scheduled for concurrence on 06/05/2022. |
2022-06-03 | House | Received from the Senate with amendments. |
2022-06-03 | Senate | Rules suspended. The amended bill was read by title, passed by a vote of 30 yeas and 0 nays, and ordered returned to the House. Motion to reconsider tabled. |
2022-06-02 | Senate | Reported without Legislative Bureau amendments. Read by title and passed to third reading and final passage. |
2022-06-02 | Senate | Rules suspended. Reported with amendments. Rules suspended. Committee amendments read and adopted. Read by title and referred to the Legislative Bureau. |
2022-05-25 | Senate | Read second time by title and referred to the Committee on Education. |
2022-05-24 | Senate | Received in the Senate. Read first time by title and placed on the Calendar for a second reading. |
2022-05-23 | House | Read third time by title, amended, roll called on final passage, yeas 94, nays 0. Finally passed, title adopted, ordered to the Senate. |
2022-05-23 | House | Called from the calendar. |
2022-05-19 | House | Scheduled for floor debate on 05/23/2022. |
2022-05-19 | House | Notice given. |
2022-05-12 | House | Read by title, returned to the calendar. |
2022-05-05 | House | Scheduled for floor debate on 05/12/2022. |
2022-05-04 | House | Read by title, amended, ordered engrossed, passed to 3rd reading. |
2022-05-03 | House | Reported with amendments (9-0). |
2022-04-06 | House | Read by title, under the rules, referred to the Committee on Education. |
2022-04-05 | House | Read by title. Lies over under the rules. |