LA HB944 | 2010 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on June 24 2010 - 100% progression
Action: 2010-06-24 - Effective date: August 15, 2010.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on June 24 2010 - 100% progression
Action: 2010-06-24 - Effective date: August 15, 2010.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
Adds the attorney general as a recipient of fire safe cigarette certifications (EN NO IMPACT See Note)
Title
Adds the attorney general as a recipient of fire safe cigarette certifications (EN NO IMPACT See Note)
Sponsors
Rep. Walt Leger [D] |
Roll Calls
Senate - Senate Vote on HB 944, FINAL PASSAGE (#1367) (Y: 38 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
House - House Vote on HB 944, FINAL PASSAGE (#122) (Y: 96 N: 0 NV: 7 Abs: 0) [PASS]
House - House Vote on HB 944, FINAL PASSAGE (#122) (Y: 96 N: 0 NV: 7 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2010-06-24 | Effective date: August 15, 2010. | |
2010-06-24 | Signed by the Governor. Becomes Act No. 529. | |
2010-06-15 | Sent to the Governor for executive approval. | |
2010-06-15 | Signed by the President of the Senate. | |
2010-06-14 | Enrolled and signed by the Speaker of the House. | |
2010-06-11 | Received from the Senate without amendments. | |
2010-06-10 | Rules suspended. Read by title, passed by a vote of 38 yeas and 0 nays, and ordered returned to the House. Motion to reconsider tabled. | |
2010-06-07 | Reported without Legislative Bureau amendments. Read by title and passed to third reading and final passage. | |
2010-06-04 | Read by title and referred to the Legislative Bureau. | |
2010-06-03 | Reported favorably. | |
2010-04-14 | Received in the Senate. Rules suspended. Read first and second time by title and referred to the Committee on Commerce, Consumer Protection and International Affairs. | |
2010-04-13 | Read third time by title, roll called on final passage, yeas 96, nays 0. Finally passed, title adopted, ordered to the Senate. | |
2010-04-08 | Scheduled for floor debate on April 13, 2010. | |
2010-04-07 | Read by title, ordered engrossed, passed to 3rd reading - regular calendar. | |
2010-04-06 | Reported favorably (19-0) (Regular). | |
2010-03-29 | Read by title, under the rules, referred to the Committee on Appropriations. | |
2010-03-19 | First appeared in the Interim Calendar on 3/19/2010. | |
2010-03-18 | Under the rules, provisionally referred to the Committee on Appropriations. | |
2010-03-18 | Prefiled. |