LA HB932 | 2016 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on May 10 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-05-10 - Effective date: 05/10/2016.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]

Summary

Provides relative to certain exemptions from the continuing education requirements for producers

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Provides relative to certain exemptions from the continuing education requirements for producers

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2016-05-03 - Senate - Senate Vote on HB 932 FINAL PASSAGE (#553) (Y: 38 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2016-04-14 - House - House Vote on HB 932 FINAL PASSAGE (#322) (Y: 91 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 13) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2016-05-10HouseEffective date: 05/10/2016.
2016-05-10HouseSigned by the Governor. Becomes Act No. 72.
2016-05-05HouseSent to the Governor for executive approval.
2016-05-05SenateSigned by the President of the Senate.
2016-05-04HouseEnrolled and signed by the Speaker of the House.
2016-05-03HouseReceived from the Senate without amendments.
2016-05-03SenateRead by title, passed by a vote of 38 yeas and 0 nays, and ordered returned to the House. Motion to reconsider tabled.
2016-05-02SenateReported without Legislative Bureau amendments. Read by title and passed to third reading and final passage.
2016-04-28SenateRead by title and referred to the Legislative Bureau.
2016-04-27SenateReported favorably.
2016-04-19SenateRead second time by title and referred to the Committee on Insurance.
2016-04-18SenateReceived in the Senate. Read first time by title and placed on the Calendar for a second reading.
2016-04-14HouseRead third time by title, amended, roll called on final passage, yeas 91, nays 0. Finally passed, title adopted, ordered to the Senate.
2016-04-07HouseScheduled for floor debate on 04/14/2016.
2016-04-07HouseRead by title, ordered engrossed, passed to 3rd reading.
2016-04-06HouseReported favorably (12-0).
2016-03-30HouseRead by title, under the rules, referred to the Committee on Insurance.
2016-03-29HouseRead by title.

Subjects


Louisiana State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttp://www.legis.la.gov/legis/BillInfo.aspx?s=16rs&b=HB932&sbi=y
Texthttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=988145
Texthttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=991965
Texthttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=994810
Texthttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1000219
Texthttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1002946
Amendmenthttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=993708
Supplementhttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=988146
Supplementhttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=992313
Supplementhttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=994951
Supplementhttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1016897
Roll Callhttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=994788
Roll Callhttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=999976

Bill Comments

feedback