LA HB912 | 2022 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Engrossed on May 15 2022 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2022-06-06 - Notice House Conference Committee members appointed.
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on May 15 2022 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2022-06-06 - Notice House Conference Committee members appointed.
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
Makes technical changes to certain provisions relative to the manner in which ballots are prepared and marked
Title
Makes technical changes to certain provisions relative to the manner in which ballots are prepared and marked
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2022-06-05 - House - House Vote on HB 912 REJECT SENATE AMENDMENTS (#1563) (Y: 101 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2022-06-01 - Senate - Senate Vote on HB 912 FINAL PASSAGE (#1125) (Y: 34 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2022-05-12 - House - House Vote on HB 912 HB 912 BY MAGEE (#818) (Y: 97 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 8) [PASS]
2022-06-01 - Senate - Senate Vote on HB 912 FINAL PASSAGE (#1125) (Y: 34 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2022-05-12 - House - House Vote on HB 912 HB 912 BY MAGEE (#818) (Y: 97 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 8) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-06-06 | Senate | Notice House Conference Committee members appointed. |
2022-06-06 | House | Notice of Senate conferees appointed. |
2022-06-06 | Senate | Senate conference committee members appointed: Hewitt, Reese, and Milligan. |
2022-06-06 | House | House conferees appointed: Magee, Stefanski, and Jenkins. |
2022-06-05 | Senate | Notice House rejected the Senate amendments. |
2022-06-05 | House | Read by title, roll called, yeas 101, nays 0, Senate amendments rejected, conference committee appointment pending. |
2022-06-02 | House | Scheduled for concurrence on 06/05/2022. |
2022-06-02 | House | Received from the Senate with amendments. |
2022-06-01 | Senate | Rules suspended. The amended bill was read by title, passed by a vote of 34 yeas and 0 nays, and ordered returned to the House. Motion to reconsider tabled. |
2022-05-31 | Senate | Reported without Legislative Bureau amendments. Read by title and passed to third reading and final passage. |
2022-05-26 | Senate | Committee amendments read and adopted. Read by title and referred to the Legislative Bureau. |
2022-05-25 | Senate | Reported with amendments. |
2022-05-16 | Senate | Read second time by title and referred to the Committee on Senate and Governmental Affairs. |
2022-05-15 | Senate | Received in the Senate. Read first time by title and placed on the Calendar for a second reading. |
2022-05-12 | House | Read third time by title, amended, roll called on final passage, yeas 97, nays 0. Finally passed, title adopted, ordered to the Senate. |
2022-05-05 | House | Scheduled for floor debate on 05/12/2022. |
2022-05-04 | House | Read by title, ordered engrossed, passed to 3rd reading. |
2022-05-03 | House | Reported favorably (9-0). |
2022-04-05 | House | Read by title, under the rules, referred to the Committee on House and Governmental Affairs. |
2022-04-04 | House | Read by title. Lies over under the rules. |