LA HB911 | 2022 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 36-20-1)
Status: Passed on June 16 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-06-16 - Effective date: 08/01/2022.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 36-20-1)
Status: Passed on June 16 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-06-16 - Effective date: 08/01/2022.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
Provides relative to early literacy (EN INCREASE LF EX See Note)
Title
Provides relative to early literacy (EN INCREASE LF EX See Note)
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2022-06-05 - House - House Vote on HB 911 CONCUR IN SENATE AMENDMENTS (#1604) (Y: 93 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 12) [PASS]
2022-06-03 - Senate - Senate Vote on HB 911 FINAL PASSAGE (#1324) (Y: 32 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 6) [PASS]
2022-05-18 - House - House Vote on HB 911 FINAL PASSAGE (#944) (Y: 94 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 11) [PASS]
2022-06-03 - Senate - Senate Vote on HB 911 FINAL PASSAGE (#1324) (Y: 32 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 6) [PASS]
2022-05-18 - House - House Vote on HB 911 FINAL PASSAGE (#944) (Y: 94 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 11) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-06-16 | House | Effective date: 08/01/2022. |
2022-06-16 | House | Signed by the Governor. Becomes Act No. 520. |
2022-06-07 | House | Sent to the Governor for executive approval. |
2022-06-06 | Senate | Signed by the President of the Senate. |
2022-06-06 | House | Enrolled and signed by the Speaker of the House. |
2022-06-05 | House | Read by title, roll called, yeas 93, nays 0, Senate amendments concurred in. |
2022-06-03 | House | Scheduled for concurrence on 06/05/2022. |
2022-06-03 | House | Received from the Senate with amendments. |
2022-06-03 | Senate | Rules suspended. Senate floor amendments read and adopted. Read by title, passed by a vote of 32 yeas and 0 nays, and ordered returned to the House. Motion to reconsider tabled. |
2022-06-02 | Senate | Reported without Legislative Bureau amendments. Read by title and passed to third reading and final passage. |
2022-06-02 | Senate | Rules suspended. Reported favorably. Rules suspended. Read by title and referred to the Legislative Bureau. |
2022-05-31 | Senate | Read by title. Recommitted to the Committee on Finance. |
2022-05-31 | Senate | Reported favorably. |
2022-05-23 | Senate | Read second time by title and referred to the Committee on Education. |
2022-05-19 | Senate | Received in the Senate. Read first time by title and placed on the Calendar for a second reading. |
2022-05-18 | House | Read third time by title, amended, roll called on final passage, yeas 94, nays 0. Finally passed, title adopted, ordered to the Senate. |
2022-05-17 | House | Scheduled for floor debate on 05/18/2022. |
2022-05-17 | House | Read by title, amended, ordered reengrossed, passed to 3rd reading. |
2022-05-16 | House | Reported with amendments (15-0). |
2022-04-28 | House | Read by title, amended, ordered engrossed, recommitted to the Committee on Appropriations. |
2022-04-27 | House | Reported with amendments (9-0) with recommendation to recommit to the Committee on Appropriations. |
2022-04-05 | House | Read by title, under the rules, referred to the Committee on Education. |
2022-04-04 | House | Read by title. Lies over under the rules. |