LA HB909 | 2022 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Passed on June 17 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-06-17 - Effective date: 06/17/2022.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Passed on June 17 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-06-17 - Effective date: 06/17/2022.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
Establishes a continuum of care program for certain pregnant women and parents of young children (EN +$1,000,000 SD EX See Note)
Title
Establishes a continuum of care program for certain pregnant women and parents of young children (EN +$1,000,000 SD EX See Note)
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2022-06-05 - House - House Vote on HB 909 CONCUR IN SENATE AMENDMENTS (#1562) (Y: 81 N: 13 NV: 0 Abs: 11) [PASS]
2022-06-01 - Senate - Senate Vote on HB 909 FINAL PASSAGE (#1132) (Y: 34 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2022-05-17 - House - House Vote on HB 909 FINAL PASSAGE (#885) (Y: 73 N: 23 NV: 0 Abs: 9) [PASS]
2022-05-17 - House - House Vote on HB 909 FINAL PASSAGE (#885) (Y: 73 N: 22 NV: 0 Abs: 10) [PASS]
2022-06-01 - Senate - Senate Vote on HB 909 FINAL PASSAGE (#1132) (Y: 34 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2022-05-17 - House - House Vote on HB 909 FINAL PASSAGE (#885) (Y: 73 N: 23 NV: 0 Abs: 9) [PASS]
2022-05-17 - House - House Vote on HB 909 FINAL PASSAGE (#885) (Y: 73 N: 22 NV: 0 Abs: 10) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-06-17 | House | Effective date: 06/17/2022. |
2022-06-17 | House | Signed by the Governor. Becomes Act No. 561. |
2022-06-07 | House | Sent to the Governor for executive approval. |
2022-06-06 | Senate | Signed by the President of the Senate. |
2022-06-06 | House | Enrolled and signed by the Speaker of the House. |
2022-06-05 | House | Read by title, roll called, yeas 81, nays 13, Senate amendments concurred in. |
2022-06-02 | House | Scheduled for concurrence on 06/05/2022. |
2022-06-02 | House | Received from the Senate with amendments. |
2022-06-01 | Senate | Rules suspended. The amended bill was read by title, passed by a vote of 34 yeas and 0 nays, and ordered returned to the House. Motion to reconsider tabled. |
2022-05-31 | Senate | Reported without Legislative Bureau amendments. Read by title and passed to third reading and final passage. |
2022-05-26 | Senate | Committee amendments read and adopted. Read by title and referred to the Legislative Bureau. |
2022-05-25 | Senate | Reported with amendments. |
2022-05-19 | Senate | Read second time by title and referred to the Committee on Finance. |
2022-05-18 | Senate | Received in the Senate. Read first time by title and placed on the Calendar for a second reading. |
2022-05-17 | House | Read third time by title, amended, roll called on final passage, yeas 73, nays 23. Finally passed, title adopted, ordered to the Senate. |
2022-05-12 | House | Scheduled for floor debate on 05/17/2022. |
2022-05-10 | House | Read by title, passed to 3rd reading. |
2022-05-09 | House | Reported favorably (13-0). |
2022-05-03 | House | Read by title, recommitted to the Committee on Appropriations. |
2022-05-03 | House | Called from the calendar. |
2022-05-03 | House | Read by title, amended, returned to the calendar. |
2022-05-03 | House | Called from the calendar. |
2022-05-02 | House | Scheduled for floor debate on 05/03/2022. |
2022-05-02 | House | Notice given. |
2022-05-02 | House | Read by title, returned to the calendar. |
2022-05-02 | House | Called from the calendar. |
2022-04-28 | House | Scheduled for floor debate on 05/02/2022. |
2022-04-28 | House | Notice given. |
2022-04-28 | House | Read by title, returned to the calendar. |
2022-04-28 | House | Called from the calendar. |
2022-04-26 | House | Scheduled for floor debate on 04/28/2022. |
2022-04-26 | House | Notice given. |
2022-04-26 | House | Read by title, returned to the calendar. |
2022-04-20 | House | Scheduled for floor debate on 04/26/2022. |
2022-04-18 | House | Read by title, ordered engrossed, passed to 3rd reading. |
2022-04-13 | House | Reported favorably (16-0). |
2022-04-05 | House | Read by title, under the rules, referred to the Committee on Health and Welfare. |
2022-04-04 | House | Read by title. Lies over under the rules. |