LA HB90 | 2022 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 9-2-1)
Status: Engrossed on May 4 2022 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2022-05-12 - Read by title. Recommitted to the Committee on Finance.
Pending: Senate Finance Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on May 4 2022 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2022-05-12 - Read by title. Recommitted to the Committee on Finance.
Pending: Senate Finance Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
Creates the office on women's health within the La. Department of Health and provides for the duties and functions of the office (EG INCREASE GF EX See Note)
Title
Creates the office on women's health within the La. Department of Health and provides for the duties and functions of the office (EG INCREASE GF EX See Note)
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2022-05-03 - House - House Vote on HB 90 FINAL PASSAGE (#607) (Y: 76 N: 20 NV: 0 Abs: 9) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-05-12 | Senate | Read by title. Recommitted to the Committee on Finance. |
2022-05-11 | Senate | Rules suspended. Reported favorably. |
2022-05-09 | Senate | Read second time by title and referred to the Committee on Health and Welfare. |
2022-05-04 | Senate | Received in the Senate. Read first time by title and placed on the Calendar for a second reading. |
2022-05-03 | House | Read third time by title, roll called on final passage, yeas 76, nays 20. Finally passed, title adopted, ordered to the Senate. |
2022-04-28 | House | Scheduled for floor debate on 05/03/2022. |
2022-04-26 | House | Read by title, ordered engrossed, passed to 3rd reading. |
2022-04-25 | House | Reported favorably (13-0). |
2022-03-24 | House | Read by title, amended, ordered engrossed, recommitted to the Committee on Appropriations. |
2022-03-23 | House | Reported with amendments (14-0). |
2022-03-14 | House | Read by title, under the rules, referred to the Committee on Health and Welfare. |
2022-02-18 | House | First appeared in the Interim Calendar on 2/18/2022. |
2022-02-17 | House | Under the rules, provisionally referred to the Committee on Health and Welfare. |
2022-02-17 | House | Prefiled. |