LA HB9 | 2020 | 2nd Special Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 21-1)
Status: Engrossed on October 13 2020 - 50% progression
Action: 2020-10-13 - Received in the Senate; read by title Rules suspended. Read second time by title and referred to the Committee on Judiciary B.
Pending: Senate Judiciary B Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]

Summary

Provides relative to the free exercise of religion during a public health emergency (Items #2, 28, and 60) (RE SEE FISC NOTE LF EX See Note)

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Provides relative to the free exercise of religion during a public health emergency (Items #2, 28, and 60) (RE SEE FISC NOTE LF EX See Note)

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2020-10-13 - House - House Vote on HB 9 FINAL PASSAGE (#93) (Y: 66 N: 24 NV: 0 Abs: 15) [PASS]
2020-10-13 - House - House Vote on HB 9 FINAL PASSAGE (#93) (Y: 66 N: 23 NV: 0 Abs: 16) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2020-10-13SenateReceived in the Senate; read by title Rules suspended. Read second time by title and referred to the Committee on Judiciary B.
2020-10-13HouseRead third time by title, amended, roll called on final passage, yeas 66, nays 24. Finally passed, title adopted, ordered to the Senate.
2020-10-12HouseScheduled for floor debate on 10/13/20.
2020-10-12HouseRead by title, ordered engrossed, passed to 3rd reading.
2020-10-07HouseReported favorably (6-3).
2020-09-28HouseRead by title, rules suspended, referred to the Committee on Administration of Criminal Justice.
2020-09-28HouseUnder the rules, provisionally referred to the Committee on Civil Law and Procedure.
2020-09-25HousePrefiled.

Subjects


Louisiana State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttp://www.legis.la.gov/legis/BillInfo.aspx?s=202ES&b=HB9&sbi=y
Texthttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1188795
Texthttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1191408
Texthttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1192316
Amendmenthttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1190726
Amendmenthttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1191407
Amendmenthttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1192168
Amendmenthttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1191991
Supplementhttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1188801
Supplementhttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1191179
Supplementhttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1191541
Supplementhttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1192009
Supplementhttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1192423
Supplementhttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1193051
Roll Callhttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1192281
Roll Callhttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1192383

Bill Comments

feedback