LA HB9 | 2020 | 1st Special Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on July 9 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-07-09 - Effective date: See Act.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]

Summary

Provides for the transfer, deposit, and use of monies among state funds (Item #10) (EN SEE FISC NOTE SD RV See Note)

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Provides for the transfer, deposit, and use of monies among state funds (Item #10) (EN SEE FISC NOTE SD RV See Note)

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2020-06-30 - House - House Vote on HB 9 MOTION TO ADOPT (#189) (Y: 99 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2020-06-30 - Senate - Senate Vote on HB 9 ADOPT (#185) (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-06-30 - House - House Vote on HB 9 REJECT SENATE AMENDMENTS (#178) (Y: 98 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 6) [PASS]
2020-06-29 - Senate - Senate Vote on HB 9 FINAL PASSAGE (#159) (Y: 37 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2020-06-10 - House - House Vote on HB 9 FINAL PASSAGE (#18) (Y: 100 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2020-07-09HouseEffective date: See Act.
2020-07-09HouseSigned by the Governor. Becomes Act No. 10.
2020-07-01HouseSent to the Governor for executive approval.
2020-06-30SenateSigned by the President of the Senate.
2020-06-30HouseEnrolled and signed by the Speaker of the House.
2020-06-30HouseNotice of Senate adoption of Conference Committee Report.
2020-06-30SenateConference Committee Report read; adopted by a vote of 39 yeas and 0 nays.
2020-06-30SenateNotice House adopted the Conference Committee Report.
2020-06-30HouseConference Committee Report read, roll called, yeas 99, nays 0. The Conference Committee Report was adopted.
2020-06-30HouseRules suspended.
2020-06-30HouseConference Committee report received.
2020-06-30HouseNotice of Senate conferees appointed.
2020-06-30SenateSenate conference committee members appointed: White, Cloud, and Tarver.
2020-06-30SenateNotice House Conference Committee members appointed.
2020-06-30SenateNotice House rejected the Senate amendments.
2020-06-30HouseHouse conferees appointed: Zeringue, Carrier, and Wheat.
2020-06-30HouseRead by title, roll called, yeas 98, nays 0, Senate amendments rejected, conference committee appointment pending.
2020-06-30HouseCalled from the calendar.
2020-06-29HouseRead by title, returned to the calendar.
2020-06-29HouseReceived from the Senate with amendments.
2020-06-29SenateSenate floor amendments read and adopted. Read by title, passed by a vote of 37 yeas and 0 nays, and ordered returned to the House. Motion to reconsider tabled.
2020-06-29SenateRules suspended. Called from the Calendar.
2020-06-26SenateRead by title and returned to the Calendar, subject to call.
2020-06-26SenateRules suspended.
2020-06-25SenateReported with Legislative Bureau amendments which were read and adopted. Read by title and passed to third reading and final passage.
2020-06-24SenateRules suspended. Reported with amendments. Rules suspended. Committee amendments read and adopted. Read by title and referred to the Legislative Bureau.
2020-06-17SenateRead by title. Recommitted to the Committee on Finance.
2020-06-17SenateRules suspended. Recalled from Committee.
2020-06-11SenateReceived in the Senate; read by title Rules suspended. Read second time by title and referred to the Committee on Finance.
2020-06-10HouseRead third time by title, amended, roll called on final passage, yeas 100, nays 0. Finally passed, title adopted, ordered to the Senate.
2020-06-05HouseMade Special Order of the day No. 6 for 06/10/20.
2020-06-05HouseRead by title, amended, ordered engrossed, passed to 3rd reading.
2020-06-05HouseRules suspended.
2020-06-05HouseReported with amendments (19-0).
2020-06-01HouseRead by title, rules suspended, referred to the Committee on Appropriations.

Subjects


Louisiana State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttp://www.legis.la.gov/legis/BillInfo.aspx?s=201ES&b=HB9&sbi=y
Texthttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1178839
Texthttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1180350
Texthttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1181378
Texthttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1185195
Texthttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1185675
Amendmenthttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1179519
Amendmenthttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1180008
Amendmenthttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1180330
Amendmenthttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1180655
Amendmenthttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1183769
Amendmenthttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1183938
Amendmenthttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1184024
Amendmenthttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1184786
Amendmenthttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1185007
Roll Callhttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1185048
Supplementhttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1178841
Supplementhttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1179943
Supplementhttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1180361
Supplementhttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1181062
Supplementhttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1181400
Supplementhttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1182816
Supplementhttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1184005
Supplementhttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1185114
Supplementhttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1185795
Roll Callhttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1181368
Roll Callhttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1184884
Roll Callhttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1185148
Roll Callhttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1185145

Bill Comments

feedback