LA HB9 | 2018 | 3rd Special Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on June 18 2018 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2018-06-24 - Withdrawn from the files of the House.
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on June 18 2018 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2018-06-24 - Withdrawn from the files of the House.
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
Provides for the rate and base of state sales and use tax (Item #1) (EG +$360,000,000 GF RV See Note)
Title
Provides for the rate and base of state sales and use tax (Item #1) (EG +$360,000,000 GF RV See Note)
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-06-24 | House | Withdrawn from the files of the House. |
2018-06-24 | House | Called from the calendar. |
2018-06-24 | House | Rules suspended. |
2018-06-22 | House | Notice removed |
2018-06-21 | House | Scheduled for floor debate on 06/22/18. |
2018-06-21 | House | Notice given. |
2018-06-21 | House | Read by title, returned to the calendar. |
2018-06-20 | House | Scheduled for floor debate on 06/21/18. |
2018-06-20 | House | Read by title, amended, ordered engrossed, passed to 3rd reading. |
2018-06-20 | House | Rules suspended. |
2018-06-20 | House | Reported with amendments (16-0). |
2018-06-18 | House | Read by title, rules suspended, referred to the Committee on Ways and Means. |
2018-06-18 | House | Prefiled. |