LA HB891 | 2018 | Regular Session
Note: Replaces legislation HB338
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 44-12-2)
Status: Passed on May 23 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-05-23 - Effective date: See Act.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 44-12-2)
Status: Passed on May 23 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-05-23 - Effective date: See Act.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
Provides relative to the prohibition on public funding for entities that perform abortions (EN NO IMPACT See Note)
Title
Provides relative to the prohibition on public funding for entities that perform abortions (EN NO IMPACT See Note)
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2018-05-16 - House - House Vote on HB 891 CONCUR IN SENATE AMENDMENTS (#1212) (Y: 84 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 20) [PASS]
2018-05-09 - Senate - Senate Vote on HB 891 FINAL PASSAGE (#911) (Y: 28 N: 5 NV: 0 Abs: 6) [PASS]
2018-04-12 - House - House Vote on HB 891 FINAL PASSAGE (#413) (Y: 90 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 12) [PASS]
2018-05-09 - Senate - Senate Vote on HB 891 FINAL PASSAGE (#911) (Y: 28 N: 5 NV: 0 Abs: 6) [PASS]
2018-04-12 - House - House Vote on HB 891 FINAL PASSAGE (#413) (Y: 90 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 12) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-05-23 | House | Effective date: See Act. |
2018-05-23 | House | Signed by the Governor. Becomes Act No. 498. |
2018-05-23 | House | Sent to the Governor for executive approval. |
2018-05-18 | Senate | Signed by the President of the Senate on 5/22/2018. |
2018-05-18 | House | Enrolled and signed by the Speaker of the House. |
2018-05-16 | House | Read by title, roll called, yeas 84, nays 0, Senate amendments concurred in. |
2018-05-11 | House | Scheduled for concurrence on 05/16/18. |
2018-05-09 | House | Received from the Senate with amendments. |
2018-05-09 | Senate | Senate floor amendments read and adopted. Read by title, passed by a vote of 28 yeas and 5 nays, and ordered returned to the House. Motion to reconsider tabled. |
2018-04-30 | Senate | Reported without Legislative Bureau amendments. Read by title and passed to third reading and final passage. |
2018-04-26 | Senate | Read by title and referred to the Legislative Bureau. |
2018-04-25 | Senate | Rules suspended. Reported favorably. |
2018-04-17 | Senate | Read second time by title and referred to the Committee on Health and Welfare. |
2018-04-16 | Senate | Received in the Senate. Read first time by title and placed on the Calendar for a second reading. |
2018-04-12 | House | Read third time by title, roll called on final passage, yeas 90, nays 3. Finally passed, title adopted, ordered to the Senate. |
2018-04-06 | House | Scheduled for floor debate on 04/12/18. |
2018-04-06 | House | Read by title, ordered engrossed, passed to 3rd reading. |
2018-04-05 | House | Read by title, substitute title adopted, lies over in the same order of business, substitute for HB No. 338 reported by the Committee on Health and Welfare (10-0). |
Same As/Similar To
HB338 (Replaces) 2018-04-05 - Becomes HB 891.