LA HB890 | 2016 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on May 27 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-05-27 - Effective date: See Act.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on May 27 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-05-27 - Effective date: See Act.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
Makes revisions to the La. Election Code (EN SEE FISC NOTE GF EX See Note)
Title
Makes revisions to the La. Election Code (EN SEE FISC NOTE GF EX See Note)
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2016-05-19 - House - House Vote on HB 890 CONCUR IN SENATE AMENDMENTS (#922) (Y: 83 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 21) [PASS]
2016-05-17 - Senate - Senate Vote on HB 890 FINAL PASSAGE (#810) (Y: 37 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2016-03-31 - House - House Vote on HB 890 FINAL PASSAGE (#114) (Y: 90 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 14) [PASS]
2016-05-17 - Senate - Senate Vote on HB 890 FINAL PASSAGE (#810) (Y: 37 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2016-03-31 - House - House Vote on HB 890 FINAL PASSAGE (#114) (Y: 90 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 14) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-05-27 | House | Effective date: See Act. |
2016-05-27 | House | Signed by the Governor. Becomes Act No. 281. |
2016-05-24 | House | Sent to the Governor for executive approval. |
2016-05-23 | Senate | Signed by the President of the Senate. |
2016-05-23 | House | Enrolled and signed by the Speaker of the House. |
2016-05-19 | House | Read by title, roll called, yeas 83, nays 0, Senate amendments concurred in. |
2016-05-19 | House | Rules suspended, called out of its regular order. |
2016-05-17 | House | Received from the Senate with amendments. |
2016-05-17 | Senate | The amended bill was read by title, passed by a vote of 37 yeas and 0 nays, and ordered returned to the House. Motion to reconsider tabled. |
2016-05-16 | Senate | Reported with Legislative Bureau amendments which were read and adopted. Read by title and passed to third reading and final passage. |
2016-05-12 | Senate | Committee amendments read and adopted. Read by title and referred to the Legislative Bureau. |
2016-05-11 | Senate | Reported with amendments. |
2016-04-05 | Senate | Read second time by title and referred to the Committee on Senate and Governmental Affairs. |
2016-04-04 | Senate | Received in the Senate. Read first time by title and placed on the Calendar for a second reading. |
2016-03-31 | House | Read third time by title, amended, roll called on final passage, yeas 90, nays 0. Finally passed, title adopted, ordered to the Senate. |
2016-03-24 | House | Scheduled for floor debate on 03/31/2016. |
2016-03-24 | House | Read by title, amended, ordered engrossed, passed to 3rd reading. |
2016-03-23 | House | Reported with amendments (9-0). |
2016-03-14 | House | Read by title, under the rules, referred to the Committee on House and Governmental Affairs. |
2016-03-04 | House | First appeared in the Interim Calendar on 3/4/2016. |
2016-03-04 | House | Under the rules, provisionally referred to the Committee on House and Governmental Affairs. |
2016-03-04 | House | Prefiled. |