LA HB89 | 2019 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 11-4-1)
Status: Introduced on March 19 2019 - 25% progression
Action: 2019-04-08 - Read by title, under the rules, referred to the Committee on Education.
Pending: House Education Committee
Hearing: Apr 24 @ 10:30 am in Room 1
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]

Summary

Renames the Northwest La. Technical College as the Northwest Louisiana Technical Community College and provides for an expansion of its mission and educational program (OR INCREASE SG EX See Note)

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Renames the Northwest La. Technical College as the Northwest Louisiana Technical Community College and provides for an expansion of its mission and educational program (OR INCREASE SG EX See Note)

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2019-04-08HouseRead by title, under the rules, referred to the Committee on Education.
2019-03-22HouseFirst appeared in the Interim Calendar on 3/22/2019.
2019-03-19HouseUnder the rules, provisionally referred to the Committee on Education.
2019-03-19HousePrefiled.

Subjects


Louisiana State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback