LA HB871 | 2022 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 4-0)
Status: Engrossed on May 31 2022 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2022-06-01 - Read second time by title and referred to the Committee on Transportation, Highways and Public Works.
Pending: Senate Transportation, Highways & Public Works Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on May 31 2022 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2022-06-01 - Read second time by title and referred to the Committee on Transportation, Highways and Public Works.
Pending: Senate Transportation, Highways & Public Works Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
Provides relative to a failure to honor a written promise to appear (RE -$4,779,681 SG RV See Note)
Title
Provides relative to a failure to honor a written promise to appear (RE -$4,779,681 SG RV See Note)
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2022-05-26 - House - House Vote on HB 871 FINAL PASSAGE (#1225) (Y: 92 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 13) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-06-01 | Senate | Read second time by title and referred to the Committee on Transportation, Highways and Public Works. |
2022-05-31 | Senate | Received in the Senate. Read first time by title and placed on the Calendar for a second reading. |
2022-05-26 | House | Read third time by title, roll called on final passage, yeas 92, nays 0. Finally passed, title adopted, ordered to the Senate. |
2022-05-26 | House | Called from the calendar. |
2022-05-23 | House | Scheduled for floor debate on 05/26/2022. |
2022-05-23 | House | Notice given. |
2022-05-23 | House | Read by title, returned to the calendar. |
2022-05-23 | House | Called from the calendar. |
2022-05-19 | House | Scheduled for floor debate on 05/23/2022. |
2022-05-19 | House | Notice given. |
2022-05-19 | House | Read by title, returned to the calendar. |
2022-05-19 | House | Called from the calendar. |
2022-05-18 | House | Scheduled for floor debate on 05/19/2022. |
2022-05-18 | House | Notice given. |
2022-05-18 | House | Read by title, returned to the calendar. |
2022-05-18 | House | Called from the calendar. |
2022-05-17 | House | Scheduled for floor debate on 05/18/2022. |
2022-05-17 | House | Notice given. |
2022-05-17 | House | Read by title, returned to the calendar. |
2022-05-12 | House | Scheduled for floor debate on 05/17/2022. |
2022-05-10 | House | Read by title, amended, ordered engrossed, passed to 3rd reading. |
2022-05-09 | House | Reported with amendments (8-1-1). |
2022-03-29 | House | Read by title, under the rules, referred to the Committee on Transportation, Highways and Public Works. |
2022-03-28 | House | Read by title. Lies over under the rules. |