LA HB871 | 2012 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 7-3-1)
Status: Introduced on March 12 2012 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2012-04-16 - Involuntarily deferred in committee.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on March 12 2012 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2012-04-16 - Involuntarily deferred in committee.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Requires voter approval before local governing authorities may impose civil fines for traffic violations captured by automated traffic enforcement systems (OR DECREASE LF RV See Note)
Title
Requires voter approval before local governing authorities may impose civil fines for traffic violations captured by automated traffic enforcement systems (OR DECREASE LF RV See Note)
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2012-04-16 | Involuntarily deferred in committee. | |
2012-03-12 | Read by title, under the rules, referred to the Committee on Municipal, Parochial and Cultural Affairs. | |
2012-03-03 | First appeared in the Interim Calendar on 3/2/2012. | |
2012-03-02 | Under the rules, provisionally referred to the Committee on Municipal, Parochial and Cultural Affairs. | |
2012-03-02 | Prefiled. |
Subjects
Louisiana State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.legis.state.la.us/billdata/byinst.asp?sessionid=12rs&billid=HB871 |
Text | https://www.legis.state.la.us/billdata/streamdocument.asp?did=780437 |