LA HB861 | 2022 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on March 23 2022 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2022-05-04 - Becomes HB 1075.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on March 23 2022 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2022-05-04 - Becomes HB 1075.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Provides relative to inspections of family child care providers and in-home providers
Title
Provides relative to inspections of family child care providers and in-home providers
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-05-04 | House | Becomes HB 1075. |
2022-05-03 | House | Reported by substitute (9-1). |
2022-03-24 | House | Read by title, under the rules, referred to the Committee on Education. |
2022-03-23 | House | Read by title. Lies over under the rules. |