LA HB850 | 2018 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Engrossed on April 16 2018 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2018-04-17 - Read second time by title and referred to the Committee on Local and Municipal Affairs.
Pending: Senate Local & Municipal Affairs Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on April 16 2018 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2018-04-17 - Read second time by title and referred to the Committee on Local and Municipal Affairs.
Pending: Senate Local & Municipal Affairs Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
Creates the Cypress Point Improvement District in East Baton Rouge Parish
Title
Creates the Cypress Point Improvement District in East Baton Rouge Parish
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2018-04-13 - House - House Vote on HB 850 FINAL PASSAGE (#433) (Y: 86 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 18) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-04-17 | Senate | Read second time by title and referred to the Committee on Local and Municipal Affairs. |
2018-04-16 | Senate | Received in the Senate. Read first time by title and placed on the Calendar for a second reading. |
2018-04-13 | House | Read third time by title, roll called on final passage, yeas 86, nays 1. Finally passed, title adopted, ordered to the Senate. |
2018-04-09 | House | Scheduled for floor debate on 04/13/18. |
2018-04-09 | House | Read by title, ordered engrossed, passed to 3rd reading. |
2018-04-06 | House | Reported favorably (14-0). |
2018-04-04 | House | Read by title, under the rules, referred to the Committee on Municipal, Parochial and Cultural Affairs. |
2018-04-03 | House | Read by title. Lies over under the rules. |