LA HB846 | 2020 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Vetoed on June 13 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-06-15 - Veto message from the Governor received and read.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]

Summary

Establishes a Payroll Incentive Program rebate for COVID-19-impacted businesses (EN DECREASE GF RV See Note)

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Establishes a Payroll Incentive Program rebate for COVID-19-impacted businesses (EN DECREASE GF RV See Note)

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2020-06-01 - House - House Vote on HB 846 CONCUR IN SENATE AMENDMENTS (#777) (Y: 93 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 11) [PASS]
2020-06-01 - Senate - Senate Vote on HB 846 FINAL PASSAGE (#709) (Y: 30 N: 6 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2020-06-01 - Senate - Senate Vote on HB 846 2/3 vote (#708) (Y: 31 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2020-05-31 - House - House Vote on HB 846 PERMISSION TO CONSIDER AFTER THE 82ND DAY (#683) (Y: 94 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 10) [PASS]
2020-05-22 - House - House Vote on HB 846 FINAL PASSAGE (#401) (Y: 97 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 8) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2020-06-15SenateVeto message from the Governor received and read.
2020-06-15HouseVeto message received and read. Lies over under the rules.
2020-06-13HouseVetoed by the Governor.
2020-06-03HouseSent to the Governor for executive approval.
2020-06-01HouseEnrolled and signed by the Speaker of the House.
2020-06-01HouseRead by title, roll called, yeas 93, nays 0, Senate amendments concurred in.
2020-06-01SenateSigned by the President of the Senate.
2020-06-01HouseReceived from the Senate with amendments.
2020-06-01HouseRules suspended.
2020-06-01SenateSenate floor amendments read and adopted. Read by title, passed by a vote of 30 yeas and 6 nays, and ordered returned to the House. Motion to reconsider tabled.
2020-06-01HouseNotice Senate approved consideration after the 82nd calendar day.
2020-06-01SenateRead by title. The Senate approved consideration after 6:00 p.m. on the 82nd calendar day by a vote of 31 yeas and 3 nays.
2020-06-01SenateNotice House approved consideration after 6:00 p.m. on the 82nd calendar day.
2020-05-31HouseBy a vote of 94 yeas, 0 nays, having received two-thirds vote of the elected members, the House approved consideration after the 82nd calendar day.
2020-05-29SenateReported without Legislative Bureau amendments. Read by title and passed to third reading and final passage.
2020-05-29SenateRead by title and referred to the Legislative Bureau.
2020-05-29SenateRules suspended. Recalled from Committee.
2020-05-28SenateRead by title. Recommitted to the Committee on Finance.
2020-05-28SenateReported favorably.
2020-05-25SenateReceived in the Senate; read by title Rules suspended. Read second time by title and referred to the Committee on Revenue and Fiscal Affairs.
2020-05-22HouseRead third time by title, roll called on final passage, yeas 97, nays 0. Finally passed, title adopted, ordered to the Senate.
2020-05-20HouseScheduled for floor debate on 05/22/20.
2020-05-20HouseRead by title, amended, ordered reengrossed, passed to 3rd reading.
2020-05-18HouseReported with amendments (21-0).
2020-05-15HouseRead by title, amended, ordered engrossed, recommitted to the Committee on Appropriations.
2020-05-13HouseReported with amendments (12-0).
2020-05-04HouseRead by title, under the rules, referred to the Committee on Ways and Means.
2020-03-31HouseRead by title. Lies over under the rules.

Subjects


Louisiana State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttp://www.legis.la.gov/legis/BillInfo.aspx?s=20rs&b=HB846&sbi=y
Texthttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1168266
Texthttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1171218
Texthttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1173726
Texthttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1179017
Amendmenthttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1170775
Amendmenthttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1171141
Amendmenthttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1173052
Amendmenthttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1173563
Amendmenthttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1178146
Roll Callhttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1178927
Amendmenthttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1179172
Supplementhttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1168267
Supplementhttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1168845
Supplementhttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1171295
Supplementhttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1172350
Supplementhttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1173852
Supplementhttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1174394
Supplementhttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1179319
Supplementhttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1182297
Roll Callhttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1175643
Roll Callhttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1178332
Roll Callhttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1178790
Roll Callhttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1178792

Bill Comments

feedback