LA HB846 | 2018 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on May 28 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-05-28 - Effective date: 8/1/2018.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]

Summary

Provides relative to water system testing at certain businesses which apply for or hold retail food permits

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Provides relative to water system testing at certain businesses which apply for or hold retail food permits

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2018-05-16 - House - House Vote on HB 846 CONCUR IN SENATE AMENDMENTS (#1239) (Y: 87 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 17) [PASS]
2018-05-08 - Senate - Senate Vote on HB 846 FINAL PASSAGE (#873) (Y: 35 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2018-04-18 - House - House Vote on HB 846 FINAL PASSAGE (#504) (Y: 96 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 9) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2018-05-28HouseEffective date: 8/1/2018.
2018-05-28HouseSigned by the Governor. Becomes Act No. 590.
2018-05-18HouseSent to the Governor for executive approval.
2018-05-18SenateSigned by the President of the Senate.
2018-05-17HouseEnrolled and signed by the Speaker of the House.
2018-05-16HouseRead by title, roll called, yeas 87, nays 0, Senate amendments concurred in.
2018-05-16HouseCalled from the calendar.
2018-05-15HouseScheduled for floor debate on 05/16/18.
2018-05-15HouseNotice given.
2018-05-15HouseRead by title, returned to the calendar.
2018-05-11HouseScheduled for concurrence on 05/15/18.
2018-05-08HouseReceived from the Senate with amendments.
2018-05-08SenateRules suspended. The amended bill was read by title, passed by a vote of 35 yeas and 0 nays, and ordered returned to the House. Motion to reconsider tabled.
2018-05-07SenateReported without Legislative Bureau amendments. Read by title and passed to third reading and final passage.
2018-05-03SenateCommittee amendments read and adopted. Read by title and referred to the Legislative Bureau.
2018-05-02SenateReported with amendments.
2018-04-19SenateRead second time by title and referred to the Committee on Health and Welfare.
2018-04-18SenateReceived in the Senate. Rules suspended. Read first time by title and placed on the Calendar for a second reading.
2018-04-18HouseRead third time by title, roll called on final passage, yeas 96, nays 0. Finally passed, title adopted, ordered to the Senate.
2018-04-13HouseScheduled for floor debate on 04/18/18.
2018-04-12HouseRead by title, amended, ordered engrossed, passed to 3rd reading.
2018-04-11HouseReported with amendments (9-0).
2018-04-04HouseRead by title, under the rules, referred to the Committee on Health and Welfare.
2018-04-03HouseRead by title. Lies over under the rules.

Subjects


Louisiana State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttp://www.legis.la.gov/legis/BillInfo.aspx?s=18rs&b=HB846&sbi=y
Texthttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1082336
Texthttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1085492
Texthttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1098636
Texthttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1102903
Amendmenthttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1085460
Amendmenthttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1085258
Amendmenthttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1092582
Amendmenthttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1095033
Roll Callhttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1098310
Supplementhttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1082337
Supplementhttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1085714
Supplementhttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1092699
Supplementhttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1107962
Roll Callhttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1088192
Roll Callhttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1094317

Bill Comments

feedback