LA HB844 | 2022 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Independent 1-0)
Status: Introduced on March 21 2022 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2022-05-10 - Read by title, returned to the calendar.
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on March 21 2022 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2022-05-10 - Read by title, returned to the calendar.
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
Provides relative to penalties for distribution or possession with intent to distribute heroin and fentanyl and carfentanil (EG DECREASE GF EX See Note)
Title
Provides relative to penalties for distribution or possession with intent to distribute heroin and fentanyl and carfentanil (EG DECREASE GF EX See Note)
Sponsors
Rep. Daryl Adams [I] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-05-10 | House | Read by title, returned to the calendar. |
2022-05-10 | House | Called from the calendar. |
2022-05-05 | House | Scheduled for floor debate on 05/10/2022. |
2022-05-05 | House | Notice given. |
2022-05-05 | House | Read by title, returned to the calendar. |
2022-04-28 | House | Scheduled for floor debate on 05/05/2022. |
2022-04-28 | House | Read by title, amended, ordered engrossed, passed to 3rd reading. |
2022-04-27 | House | Reported with amendments (7-5). |
2022-03-22 | House | Read by title, under the rules, referred to the Committee on Administration of Criminal Justice. |
2022-03-21 | House | Read by title. Lies over under the rules. |