LA HB843 | 2020 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on June 13 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-06-13 - Effective date: 08/01/2020.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]

Summary

To provide for the regulation of industrial hemp, industrial hemp products, and industrial hemp-derived cannabidiol (CBD) products (EN INCREASE GF EX See Note)

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

To provide for the regulation of industrial hemp, industrial hemp products, and industrial hemp-derived cannabidiol (CBD) products (EN INCREASE GF EX See Note)

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2020-06-01 - House - House Vote on HB 843 MOTION TO ADOPT (#800) (Y: 100 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2020-06-01 - Senate - Senate Vote on HB 843 ADOPT (#752) (Y: 31 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 8) [PASS]
2020-05-31 - House - House Vote on HB 843 REJECT SENATE AMENDMENTS (#734) (Y: 95 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 9) [PASS]
2020-05-29 - Senate - Senate Vote on HB 843 FINAL PASSAGE (#541) (Y: 34 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2020-05-15 - House - House Vote on HB 843 HB 843 BY MR. SPEAKER (#129) (Y: 90 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 12) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2020-06-13HouseEffective date: 08/01/2020.
2020-06-13HouseSigned by the Governor. Becomes Act No. 344.
2020-06-03HouseSent to the Governor for executive approval.
2020-06-01SenateSigned by the President of the Senate.
2020-06-01HouseEnrolled and signed by the Speaker of the House.
2020-06-01SenateNotice House adopted the Conference Committee Report.
2020-06-01HouseNotice of Senate adoption of Conference Committee Report.
2020-06-01HouseConference Committee Report read, roll called, yeas 100, nays 0. The Conference Committee Report was adopted.
2020-06-01SenateConference Committee Report read; adopted by a vote of 31 yeas and 0 nays.
2020-06-01HouseConference Committee report received.
2020-06-01SenateNotice House Conference Committee members appointed.
2020-06-01SenateSenate conference committee members appointed: Cathey, Womack, and Bernard.
2020-06-01HouseNotice of Senate conferees appointed.
2020-05-31SenateNotice House rejected the Senate amendments.
2020-05-31HouseHouse conferees appointed: Schexnayder, McFarland, and Turner.
2020-05-31HouseRead by title, roll called, yeas 95, nays 0, Senate amendments rejected, conference committee appointment pending.
2020-05-29HouseScheduled for concurrence on 05/31/20.
2020-05-29HouseReceived from the Senate with amendments.
2020-05-29SenateRules suspended. Senate floor amendments read and adopted. Read by title, passed by a vote of 34 yeas and 0 nays, and ordered returned to the House. Motion to reconsider tabled.
2020-05-28SenateReported without Legislative Bureau amendments. Read by title and passed to third reading and final passage.
2020-05-28SenateRules suspended. Reported favorably. Rules suspended. Read by title and referred to the Legislative Bureau.
2020-05-26SenateRead by title. Recommitted to the Committee on Finance.
2020-05-26SenateSenate Committee amendments read and adopted.
2020-05-26SenateRules suspended. Reported with amendments.
2020-05-18SenateReceived in the Senate; read by title Rules suspended. Read second time by title and referred to the Committee on Agriculture, Forestry, Aquaculture, and Rural Development.
2020-05-15HouseRead third time by title, amended, roll called on final passage, yeas 90, nays 3. Finally passed, title adopted, ordered to the Senate.
2020-05-13HouseScheduled for floor debate on 05/15/20.
2020-05-13HouseRead by title, amended, ordered engrossed, passed to 3rd reading.
2020-05-07HouseReported with amendments (17-0).
2020-05-04HouseRead by title, under the rules, referred to the Committee on Agriculture, Forestry, Aquaculture, and Rural Development.
2020-03-31HouseRead by title. Lies over under the rules.

Subjects


Louisiana State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttp://www.legis.la.gov/legis/BillInfo.aspx?s=20rs&b=HB843&sbi=y
Texthttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1168253
Texthttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1170307
Texthttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1173252
Texthttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1179192
Texthttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1182597
Amendmenthttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1169959
Amendmenthttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1169178
Amendmenthttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1170708
Amendmenthttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1170156
Amendmenthttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1172751
Amendmenthttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1175914
Supplementhttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1176193
Amendmenthttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1177519
Amendmenthttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1177975
Supplementhttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1177587
Roll Callhttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1178477
Supplementhttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1168260
Supplementhttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1169761
Supplementhttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1170517
Supplementhttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1170801
Supplementhttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1173281
Supplementhttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1173354
Supplementhttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1175915
Supplementhttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1179099
Supplementhttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1179308
Supplementhttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1187185
Roll Callhttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1173048
Roll Callhttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1177556
Roll Callhttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1179110
Roll Callhttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1179116

Bill Comments

feedback