LA HB842 | 2020 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on June 9 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-06-09 - Effective date: 08/01/20.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on June 9 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-06-09 - Effective date: 08/01/20.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
Provides relative to the assessment, collection, and distribution of certain court costs and fees in the parish of Orleans (EN NO IMPACT LF RV See Note)
Title
Provides relative to the assessment, collection, and distribution of certain court costs and fees in the parish of Orleans (EN NO IMPACT LF RV See Note)
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2020-06-01 - House - House Vote on HB 842 CONCUR IN SENATE AMENDMENTS (#776) (Y: 95 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 9) [PASS]
2020-06-01 - Senate - Senate Vote on HB 842 FINAL PASSAGE (#710) (Y: 37 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2020-06-01 - Senate - Senate Vote on HB 842 RECONSIDER (#707) (Y: 35 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2020-06-01 - Senate - Senate Vote on HB 842 FINAL PASSAGE (#706) (Y: 34 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2020-06-01 - Senate - Senate Vote on HB 842 2/3 vote (#705) (Y: 36 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2020-05-31 - House - House Vote on HB 842 PERMISSION TO CONSIDER AFTER 82ND DAY (#712) (Y: 95 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 9) [PASS]
2020-05-15 - House - House Vote on HB 842 HB 842 BY HILFERTY (#170) (Y: 97 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 7) [PASS]
2020-06-01 - Senate - Senate Vote on HB 842 FINAL PASSAGE (#710) (Y: 37 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2020-06-01 - Senate - Senate Vote on HB 842 RECONSIDER (#707) (Y: 35 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2020-06-01 - Senate - Senate Vote on HB 842 FINAL PASSAGE (#706) (Y: 34 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2020-06-01 - Senate - Senate Vote on HB 842 2/3 vote (#705) (Y: 36 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2020-05-31 - House - House Vote on HB 842 PERMISSION TO CONSIDER AFTER 82ND DAY (#712) (Y: 95 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 9) [PASS]
2020-05-15 - House - House Vote on HB 842 HB 842 BY HILFERTY (#170) (Y: 97 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 7) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-06-09 | House | Effective date: 08/01/20. |
2020-06-09 | House | Signed by the Governor. Becomes Act No. 110. |
2020-06-03 | House | Sent to the Governor for executive approval. |
2020-06-01 | Senate | Signed by the President of the Senate. |
2020-06-01 | House | Enrolled and signed by the Speaker of the House. |
2020-06-01 | House | Read by title, roll called, yeas 95, nays 0, Senate amendments concurred in. |
2020-06-01 | House | Received from the Senate with amendments. |
2020-06-01 | Senate | Senate floor amendments read and adopted. Read by title, passed by a vote of 37 yeas and 0 nays, and ordered returned to the House. Motion to reconsider tabled. |
2020-06-01 | Senate | By a vote of 35 yeas and 0 nays. |
2020-06-01 | Senate | Reconsidered. |
2020-06-01 | Senate | The amended bill was read by title, passed by a vote of 34 yeas and 1 nays, and ordered returned to the House. Motion to reconsider tabled. |
2020-06-01 | House | Notice Senate approved consideration after the 82nd calendar day. |
2020-06-01 | Senate | Read by title. The Senate approved consideration after 6:00 p.m. on the 82nd calendar day by a vote of 36 yeas and 0 nays. |
2020-06-01 | Senate | Notice House approved consideration after 6:00 p.m. on the 82nd calendar day. |
2020-05-31 | House | By a vote of 95 yeas, 0 nays, having received two-thirds vote of the elected members, the House approved consideration after the 82nd calendar day. |
2020-05-29 | Senate | Reported without Legislative Bureau amendments. Read by title and passed to third reading and final passage. |
2020-05-29 | Senate | Rules suspended. Reported with amendments. Rules suspended. Committee amendments read and adopted. Read by title and referred to the Legislative Bureau. |
2020-05-20 | Senate | Read by title. Recommitted to the Committee on Judiciary B. |
2020-05-20 | Senate | Rules suspended. Recalled from Committee. |
2020-05-18 | Senate | Received in the Senate; read by title Rules suspended. Read second time by title and referred to the Committee on Finance. |
2020-05-15 | House | Read third time by title, amended, roll called on final passage, yeas 97, nays 1. Finally passed, title adopted, ordered to the Senate. |
2020-05-13 | House | Scheduled for floor debate on 05/15/20. |
2020-05-13 | House | Read by title, amended, ordered engrossed, passed to 3rd reading. |
2020-05-07 | House | Reported with amendments (10-0). |
2020-05-04 | House | Read by title, under the rules, referred to the Committee on Judiciary. |
2020-03-31 | House | Read by title. Lies over under the rules. |