LA HB839 | 2024 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 5-0)
Status: Introduced on April 2 2024 - 25% progression
Action: 2024-04-17 - Read by title, amended, ordered engrossed, passed to 3rd reading.
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on April 2 2024 - 25% progression
Action: 2024-04-17 - Read by title, amended, ordered engrossed, passed to 3rd reading.
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
Provides relative to step therapy or fail first protocols (OR INCREASE SG EX See Note)
Title
Provides relative to step therapy or fail first protocols (OR INCREASE SG EX See Note)
Sponsors
Rep. Troy Hebert [R] | Rep. Lawrence Bagley [R] | Rep. Jacob Braud [R] | Rep. John Illg [R] |
Rep. Roger Wilder [R] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-04-17 | House | Read by title, amended, ordered engrossed, passed to 3rd reading. |
2024-04-16 | House | Reported with amendments (15-0). |
2024-04-03 | House | Read by title, under the rules, referred to the Committee on Insurance. |
2024-04-02 | House | Read by title. Lies over under the rules. |